K&M International, Inc. v. NDY Toy, LLC et al

Plaintiff: K&M International, Inc.
Defendant: NDY Toy, LLC, Wujiang Douyi Craft Co., Ltd., Debra Yager and Helen He
Case Number: 1:2013cv00771
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. The Court upholds the decision 132 of the Magistrate Judge to grant Plaintiff's Motion 63 to Re-Designate Inspection Photographs as "Confidential," as the ruling is not clearly erroneous nor contrary to law. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/5/2015. (H,CM)
September 30, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. The Court Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Related doc # 134 ). Defendants' Motion for Order Barring Plaintiff's Evidence on Damages (Related doc # 72 ) is denied. Plaintiff to fi le Second Amended Complaint within one week and Defendants will file Answers and Counterclaims within twenty-one days thereafter. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule, complying with the paramaters set forth herein, by 10/30/2015. The Court will set a settlement conference and if no resolution is reached at that conference, the Court will entertain dispositive motions. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/30/2015. (H,CM)
September 29, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. The Court Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Related doc # 131 ). Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Related doc # 59 ) is granted. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/29/2015. (H,CM)
February 9, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion & Order. For the reasons stated herein, K&M's Motion to Re-Designate Inspection Photographs as "Confidential" (Doc. No. 63) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Greg White on 2/9/2015.(R,Sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&M International, Inc. v. NDY Toy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&M International, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund J. Ferdinand, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Alexander R. Malbin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Amanda L. McHenry(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Steven E. Seasly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDY Toy, LLC
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wujiang Douyi Craft Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Yager
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen He
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?