Rodriguez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Andrade Rodriguez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv01559
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Lesley Wells
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order DENYING 110 Motion for reconsideration filed by Estate of Juan Carlos Andrade Rodriguez, Executor Marco Antonio Rodrigo de la Torre as representative, GRANTING 108 Stipulation/Joint Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint filed by United States of America and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the 43 Third Party Complaint. Honorable Robert H. Cleland on 4/24/2017. (W,L)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DIRECTING the parties to notify the court, in writing, by 4/14/2017, whether the matter should be closed. If so, the parties are directed to submit a proposed closing order, agreed upon as to form, no later that 4/21/2017. Honorable Robert H. Cleland on 4/6/2017. (W,L)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order Regarding Seeking Concurrence in Motions and Requests. Honorable Robert H. Cleland on 2/17/2016. (W,L)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation 28 , granting in part and dismissing in part, motion to dismiss as described in the R&R (related docs 16 , 25 ). Judge Lesley Wells (C,KA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Andrade Rodriguez
Represented By: Jaime P. Serrat
Represented By: Marisa L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?