Hutchens et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Hutchens and Christin Hutchens
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00176
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Ashtabula
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Opinion and Order. Plaintiffs' Motion for a New Trial (Related doc # 262 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/22/2017. (H,CM)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Order. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony From Plaintiffs' Designated Expert Witness, Godfrey Oakley, Jr. M.D. (Related Doc # 88 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/13/2017.(H,CM)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Order. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Admission of a Document Titled "Neurology Consultant Meeting" and Other Suggestions that Depakote Should Have Been Contraindicated for the Treatment of Epilepsy in Women of Childbearing Years (Related Doc # 118 ) is granted. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/10/2017.(H,CM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order. Plaintiffs' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 94 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 95 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 98 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 99 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 101 ) is denied. Defendants' Motion in limine (Related Doc # 120 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/5/2017.(H,CM)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Dr. David M. Yousem (Related Doc # 86 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/19/2016.(H,CM)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Opinion and Order. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Related doc # 57 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/30/2016. (H,CM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchens et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hutchens
Represented By: Brian K. Balser
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Ralph D. McBride
Represented By: Nancy R. McEvily
Represented By: Heath A. Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer S. Richards
Represented By: Robert L. Salim
Represented By: Phillip L. Sampson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christin Hutchens
Represented By: Brian K. Balser
Represented By: Blair R. Loocke
Represented By: Ralph D. McBride
Represented By: Nancy R. McEvily
Represented By: Heath A. Novosad
Represented By: Jennifer S. Richards
Represented By: Robert L. Salim
Represented By: Phillip L. Sampson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Seth J. Linnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?