Cawley v. Eastman Outdoors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Trevor Cawley |
Defendant: |
John and/or Jane Does and Eastman Outdoors, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00310 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cleveland Office |
County: |
Cuyahoga |
Presiding Judge: |
James S. Gwin |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 14, 2015 |
Filing
78
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/14/15 granting in part and denying in part Defendant Eastman's motion to exclude plaintiff's expert, Dr. Scott Beckwith. Dr. Beckwith may not testify about plaintiff's medica l condition or the adequacy of the warning on the arrows but may otherwise testify about the matters contained in his expert reports. Additionally the Court denies defendant's motion to exclude Dr. Beckwith's examination of the exemplar ar row, grants in part and denies in part defendant's motion to exclude evidence of quality control procedures, grants in part and denies in part defendant's motion to exclude evidence of manufacturing standards from the composites industry and grants defendant's motion to preclude plaintiff's argument that defendant is the manufacturer of the arrows. (Related Docs. 44 , 47 , 48 , 49 , 51 ) (M,G)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing
42
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/17/14. The Court grants defendant's motion for summary judgment as to plaintiff's claims for breach of warranty, strict liability, negligence, and gross negligence in Counts Two through Five of his complaint. The Court grants in part and denies in part defendant's motion as to plaintiff's claim for product liability in Count One of his complaint. Plaintiff may proceed on his claim of manufacturing defect, but not on his claims of design defect, inadequate warning, or failure to conform to representations. The Court denies defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim for punitive damages. Finally, the Court denies defendant's motion to impose a statutory damages cap. (Related Doc. 23 ) (M,G)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
39
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/16/14. The Court denies Eastman Outdoors, Inc.'s 31 motion to quash and orders Defendant to arrange for the production of the requested documents. The Court grants in part the motio n for a protective order, and orders Plaintiff not to disclose the financial information he receives to anyone other than his counsel and expert witnesses.(S,HR) Modified to remove link to 32 . Motion still pending. NEF regenerated on 9/16/2014 (S,HR).
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
26
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/20/14. The Court denies the parties' proposed stipulated protective order and the motion of Defendant Eastman Outdoors, Inc., for leave to file Exhibit A to its motion for summary judgment under seal. (Related Docs. 20 , 25 ) (M,G)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?