Green v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Green
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv00358
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lorain
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B. Burke
Presiding Judge: Benita Y. Pearson
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) with Supporting Memorandum (Doc. 30 ) is GRANTED in the amount of $19,290.25 provided that Plaintiff's counsel refunds to Plaintiff the $4,483.50 previously paid under the EAJA. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/8/2017.(D,I)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Application for Payment of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (Doc. 24 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court awards Plaintiff EAJA fees and expenses in the amount of $4,483.50, representing 24.4 hours at an hourly rate of $183.75. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 11/17/2015. (D,I)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court REVERSES and REMANDS the Commissioner's decision for further proceedings consistent with this Opinion. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/2/2015. (D,I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Green
Represented By: Paulette F. Balin
Represented By: Matthew J. Shupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: David A. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?