Maclachlan et al v. 3M et al
Plaintiff: Pat Maclachlan and Donald Maclachlan
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc., General Refractories Company, (1 - 100) John Does, Osram Sylvania, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., Union Carbide Corp., General Electric Corporation, Quigley Company, Inc., C.P. Hall Company, Oglebay Norton Company, Honeywell International Inc., Edward R. Hart Company, Robertson-Ceco Corp., Okonite Incorporated, Corhart Refractories, Record Industrial Company, Maremont Corporation, BMI Refractory Services, Inc., Sealed Air Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Treco Construction Services, Inc., Hersh Packing & Rubber Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Sepco Corporation, A.W. Chesterton, Inc., Ford Motor Co, Flexo Products, Inc., The Mau-Sherwood Supply Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Grefco, Inc., Theim Corporation, Ohio Pipe & Supply Company Incorporated, Insul Company Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., Tenneco Automotive, Inc., Wheeler Protective Apparel Corp., Atlas Industries, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Dana Corporation, M.V.S. Company, Mobil Oil Corporation, Fairmont Supply Company, Lockheed Martin Corp., American Optical Corporation, 3M, Oakfabco, Inc., Clark Industrial Insulation Co., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Combustion Engineering, Inc., Riley Stoker Corp., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Pittsburgh Metals Purifying Co., Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division, George V. Hamilton, Inc., Safety First Industries, Inc., Allied Glove Corporation, I.U. North America, Inc., Guard-Line, Inc,, Tasco Insulations, Inc, Borg-Warner Corporation, Adience, Inc., C.E. Thurston & Sons, Inc., JNO. J. Disch Co., Rapid American Corp., Rockbestos Suprenant Cable Corp., Red Seal Electric, Uniroyal Inc., Ohio Valley Insulating Company Inc., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., U B West Virginia, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Georgia Pacific Corp., Greene Tweed & Co., Nitro Industrial Coverings Inc., Union Boiler Company, Cooper Industries, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation, DAP, Inc., Marmon Group, Inc., The Sager Corporation, Universal Refractories, Advance Stores Company, Inc., Rockwell International Corp., Norton Company, Durabla Manufacturing Co., F.B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh and Kelsey Hayes Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv10001
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2015 Filing 116 Acknowledgment from Cuyahoga County Court of receiving record on 4/16/15. (E,P)
April 14, 2015 Certified copies of Order of Remand, Judgment and Docket Sheet mailed to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgment of receipt on 4/14/15 Related document(s) #114 , #115 . (E,P)
April 13, 2015 Filing 115 Judgment. The Court has filed its Order remanding the matter to Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, for lack of jurisdiction. Accordingly, this action is terminated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/13/2015. (H,CM)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order of Remand. Since Plaintiffs have dismissed the only federal cause of action, since there is not complete diversity among the parties, and since the matter has been litigated in state court since 2003, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state causes of action and remands the case to Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court. (Related Doc #109 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/13/2015.(H,CM)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs (Related doc #112 ) as to Defendants Lockheed Martin Corporation, f/k/a Martin Marietta Corporation, 3M Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, Atlas Industries, Inc., Borg-Warner Corporation, C.P. Hall Company, Certainteed Corporation, Cooper Industries, Inc., Corhart Refractories, Dana Corporation, Durabla Mfg. Co., Edward R. Hart Company, Ericsson, Inc., F.B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh, Fairmont Supply Company, Flexo Products, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Refractories Company, Greene Tweed & Co., Grefco, Inc., Guard-Line, Inc., Hersh Packing & Rubber Co., LU. North America, Inc., Illinois Tool Works, Inc., JNO J. Disch Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, M.V.S. Company, Maremont Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mobil Oil Corporation, Nitro Industrial Coverings, Inc., Norton Company KNA Saint Gobain Abrasives Inc., Oakfabco Inc., Oglebay Norton Company, Ohio Pipe & Supply Company Incorporated, Ohio Valley Insulating Company, Inc., Okonite Incorporated, Osram Sylvania, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Pittsburgh Metals Purifying Co., Quigley Company, Inc., Rapid-American Corp., Record Industrial Company, Red Seal Electric Co., Riley Power, Inc. f/k/a Babcock Borsig Power, Inc. f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation, Robertson-Ceco Corp., Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Safety First Industries, Inc., Sager Corporation, Sealed Air Corporation, Sepco Corporation, Tasco Insulation Co., The Marmon Group, Inc., The Mau Shenvood Supply Company, Theim Corporation, Treco Construction Services, Union Boiler Company, Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division of Uniroyal, Inc, Uniroyal, Inc., Universal Refractories, and Wheeler Protective Apparel Corp. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/13/2015. (H,CM)
March 31, 2015 Filing 112 Motion to dismiss party Various Defendants Without Prejudice filed by Donald Maclachlan, Pat Maclachlan. (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
March 11, 2015 Filing 111 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice as to Various Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cavanaugh, Ryan) Modified text on 3/12/2015 (H,KR).
February 24, 2015 Filing 110 Opposition to #109 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Adience, Inc., BMI Refractory Services, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Tasco Insulations, Inc, Theim Corporation, U B West Virginia, Inc., Union Boiler Company, Universal Refractories. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
February 17, 2015 Filing 109 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Donald Maclachlan, Pat Maclachlan. (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Treco Construction's Motion to substitute attorney Timothy J. Green and law firm of Dinsmore & Shohl LLP (Related Doc #108 ); attorney Stephen C. Musilli and Richard D. Schuster removed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/2/2015.(H,CM)
February 2, 2015 Filing 108 Motion to substitute attorney Timothy J. Green and the law firm of Dinsmore & Shohl LLP in place of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP filed by Defendant Treco Construction Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Green, Timothy) Modified text on 2/3/2015 (P,G).
January 16, 2015 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Tenneco Inc. for Tenneco Automotive, Inc. filed by Tenneco Automotive, Inc.. (Goldberg, Stuart)
December 24, 2014 Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cooper Industries, Inc.. (Shafer, Bradley)
December 24, 2014 Filing 105 Answer to Complaint Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to Any and All Cross-Claims of Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC, Successor-in-Interest to Cooper Industries, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Answer to Any and All Cross-Claims Filed or To Be Filed filed by Cooper Industries, Inc.. (Shafer, Bradley)
December 24, 2014 Filing 104 Answer to Complaint Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to Any and All Cross-Claims of Defendant Addlied Glove Corporation to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Answer to Any and All Cross-Claims Filed or To Be Filed filed by Allied Glove Corporation. (Shafer, Bradley)
December 24, 2014 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allied Glove Corporation. (Shafer, Bradley)
December 17, 2014 Filing 102 Attorney Appearance by Reginald S. Kramer filed by on behalf of Osram Sylvania, Inc.. (Kramer, Reginald)
December 17, 2014 Filing 101 Attorney Appearance by Reginald S. Kramer filed by on behalf of General Electric Corporation. (Kramer, Reginald)
December 17, 2014 Filing 100 Attorney Appearance by Reginald S. Kramer filed by on behalf of Fairmont Supply Company. (Kramer, Reginald)
December 17, 2014 Filing 99 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Osram Sylvania, Inc.. (Kramer, Reginald)
December 17, 2014 Filing 98 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Fairmont Supply Company. (Kramer, Reginald)
December 17, 2014 Filing 97 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by General Electric Corporation. (Kramer, Reginald)
December 15, 2014 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Advance Stores Company, Inc.. (Daniels, Stephen) Modified text on 12/22/2014 (P, S).
December 15, 2014 Filing 95 Notice of Appearance filed by Allied Glove Corporation, Cooper Industries, Inc.. (Shafer, Bradley) Modified text on 12/22/2014 (P, S).
December 2, 2014 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant George V. Hamilton, Inc.. (Silvaggio, Joseph) Modified on 12/4/2014 (H,CM).
December 2, 2014 Filing 93 Answer to Complaint , Crossclaim against All Plaintiffs filed by George V. Hamilton, Inc.. (Silvaggio, Joseph)
December 2, 2014 Filing 92 Praecipe for Attorney Appearance by Joseph D. Silvaggio filed by on behalf of George V. Hamilton, Inc.(Silvaggio, Joseph) Modified text on 12/9/2014 (E,P).
December 2, 2014 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Oakfabco, Inc.. (Silvaggio, Joseph) Modified on 12/4/2014 (H,CM).
December 2, 2014 Filing 90 Answer to Complaint , Crossclaim against All Plaintiffs filed by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Silvaggio, Joseph)
December 2, 2014 Filing 89 Praecipe for Appearance filed by Oakfabco, Inc.. (Silvaggio, Joseph)
November 21, 2014 Filing 88 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by JNO. J. Disch Co.. (Dunn, Jr., Theodore)
November 21, 2014 Filing 87 Answer of Defendant BMI Refractory Services, Inc. to Amended Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Adience, Inc., BMI Refractory Services, Inc.. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tasco Insulations, Inc. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 85 Answer to Amended Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Tasco Insulations, Inc. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent HBMA Holdings LLC for Beazer East, Inc. filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 83 Answer to Amended Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Universal Refractories. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 81 Answer to Amended Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Universal Refractories. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Theim Corporation. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 79 Answer to Amended Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Theim Corporation. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by U B West Virginia, Inc., Union Boiler Company. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 77 Answer of Defendant UB West Virginia, Inc. f/k/a Union Boiler Company to Amended Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by U B West Virginia, Inc., Union Boiler Company. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 17, 2014 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (Hong, Laura)
November 17, 2014 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DAP, Inc.. (Hong, Laura)
November 12, 2014 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for The Marmon Group, Inc. filed by The Marmon Group, Inc.. (Hong, Laura)
November 12, 2014 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc. for Rockbestos Suprenant Cable Corp. filed by Rockbestos Suprenant Cable Corp.. (Hong, Laura)
November 12, 2014 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robertson-Ceco Corp.. (Hong, Laura)
November 11, 2014 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Dana Holding Corporation for Dana Corporation filed by Dana Corporation. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for CertainTeed Corporation filed by CertainTeed Corporation. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate 3M India Limited for 3M filed by 3M. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Waste Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Rust Engineering & Construction, Inc. for Treco Construction Services, Inc. filed by Treco Construction Services, Inc.. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 66 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Dana Corporation. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 65 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Treco Construction Services, Inc.. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 64 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CertainTeed Corporation. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 63 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 62 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by 3M. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 61 Attorney Appearance by Richard D. Schuster filed by on behalf of 3M, CertainTeed Corporation, Dana Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Treco Construction Services, Inc.. (Schuster, Richard)
November 11, 2014 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Coast Holdings Inc. for American Optical Corporation filed by American Optical Corporation. (Ross, Karen)
November 11, 2014 Filing 59 Attorney Appearance by Karen E. Ross filed by on behalf of American Optical Corporation. (Ross, Karen)
November 10, 2014 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Edward R. Hart Company. (Kline, James)
November 4, 2014 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rockwell International Corp.. (Thomas, Michael)
November 4, 2014 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BorgWarner, Inc. for Borg-Warner Corporation filed by Borg-Warner Corporation. (Kline, James)
November 4, 2014 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 54 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to all Cross Claims filed by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Flexo Products, Inc.. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 52 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to all Cross Claims filed by Flexo Products, Inc.. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M.V.S. Company. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 50 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to all Cross Claims filed by M.V.S. Company. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hersh Packing & Rubber Co.. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 48 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to all Cross Claims filed by Hersh Packing & Rubber Co.. (Kadlec, Kevin)
November 3, 2014 Filing 47 Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Thomas filed by on behalf of Rockwell International Corp. (Thomas, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Filing 46 Answer to Complaint and Answer to All Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Ford Motor Co. (Box, Susan)
November 3, 2014 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio Valley Insulating Company Inc. (Kline, James)
November 3, 2014 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Guard-Line, Inc,. (Kristan, John)
November 3, 2014 Filing 43 Attorney Appearance by John A. Kristan, Jr filed by on behalf of Guard-Line, Inc,. (Kristan, John)
October 31, 2014 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Red Seal Electric. (Valenti, John)
October 31, 2014 Filing 41 Attorney Appearance by John A. Valenti filed by on behalf of Red Seal Electric. (Valenti, John)
October 28, 2014 Filing 40 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and To Any Cross-Claims Filed or To Be Filed filed by Advance Stores Company, Inc. (Daniels, Stephen)
October 28, 2014 Filing 39 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint and to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed filed by Norton Company. (Jones, Daniel)
October 28, 2014 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Clark Industrial Insulation Co.. (Kristan, John)
October 28, 2014 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Clark Industrial Insulation Co.. (Kristan, John)
October 28, 2014 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by A.W. Chesterton, Inc.. (Patterson, John)
October 28, 2014 Filing 35 Attorney Appearance by John P. Patterson filed by on behalf of A.W. Chesterton, Inc.. (Patterson, John)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Ohio Valley Insulating, BorgWarner Morse and Edward Hart's Motions for Extension of Time until 11/14/2014 to file corporate disclosure statement (Related doc #'s #27 , #29 , #31 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/27/2014.(H,CM)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant JNO Disch's #34 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/23/2014 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/27/2014.(H,CM)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Union Boiler Company, BMI Refractory Services, Tasco Insulations, Beazer East and Theim Corporation's Motions for Extension of Time until 11/23/2014 to Answer (Related doc #'s #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/27/2014.(H,CM)
October 24, 2014 Filing 34 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11/23/2014 to answer filed by Defendant JNO. J. Disch Co.. (Dunn, Jr., Theodore)
October 24, 2014 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings, LLC for Georgia Pacific Corp. filed by Georgia Pacific Corp.. (Fox, Timothy)
October 24, 2014 Filing 32 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed, filed by Georgia Pacific Corp.. (Fox, Timothy)
October 24, 2014 Filing 31 Motion for extension of time until 11/14/2014 to File Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Edward R. Hart Company. (Mandel, Bruce)
October 24, 2014 Filing 30 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to any Cross-Claims Filed or To Be Filed, filed by The Edward R. Hart Company. (Mandel, Bruce)
October 24, 2014 Filing 29 Motion for extension of time until 11/14/2014 to File Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Borg-Warner Corporation. (Mandel, Bruce)
October 24, 2014 Filing 28 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to any Cross-Claims Filed or To Be Filed, filed by Borg-Warner Corporation. (Mandel, Bruce)
October 24, 2014 Filing 27 Motion for extension of time until 11/14/14 to File Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Ohio Valley Insulating Company Inc. (Mandel, Bruce)
October 24, 2014 Filing 26 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to any Cross-Claims Filed or to Be Filed, filed by Ohio Valley Insulating Company Inc. (Mandel, Bruce)
October 24, 2014 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Hersh Packing & Rubber Co.. (Kadlec, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Flexo Products, Inc.. (Kadlec, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by M.V.S. Company. (Kadlec, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Kadlec, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate TRW Automotive Holdings Corp for Kelsey Hayes Company filed by Kelsey Hayes Company. (Papp, Edward)
October 24, 2014 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Edward D. Papp and Diane L. Feigi, Esq. filed by on behalf of Kelsey Hayes Company. (Papp, Edward)
October 24, 2014 Filing 19 First Motion for extension of time until November 23, 2014 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Theim Corporation. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 18 First Motion for extension of time until November 23, 2014 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Beazer East, Inc. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 17 First Motion for extension of time until November 23, 2014 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Tasco Insulations, Inc. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 16 First Motion for extension of time until November 23, 2014 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant BMI Refractory Services, Inc.. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 15 First Motion for extension of time until November 23, 2014 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Union Boiler Company. (Alexandersen, Kevin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by JNO. J. Disch Co.. (Dunn, Jr., Theodore)
October 24, 2014 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Theodore M. Dunn, Jr. filed by on behalf of JNO. J. Disch Co. (Dunn, Jr., Theodore)
October 24, 2014 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for Maremont Corporation filed by Maremont Corporation. (Papp, Edward)
October 24, 2014 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Edward D. Papp and Diane L. Feigi, Esq. filed by on behalf of Maremont Corporation. (Papp, Edward)
October 23, 2014 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson for Ericsson, Inc. filed by Ericsson, Inc.. (Mitchell, Wade)
October 23, 2014 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Wade A. Mitchell and Nichol M. Kacmar filed by on behalf of Ericsson, Inc.. (Mitchell, Wade)
October 22, 2014 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Advance Stores Company, Inc.. (Daniels, Stephen)
October 21, 2014 Filing 7 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Anthony Gallucci and adding attorney Ryan J. Cavanaugh filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
October 20, 2014 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (C,B)
October 20, 2014 Filing 6 Supplement Original Complaint from State Court to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, A.W. Chesterton, Inc., Hersh Packing & Rubber Co., F.B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh, General Electric Corporation, Clark Industrial Insulation Co., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Adience, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Atlas Industries, Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Borg-Warner Corporation, Corhart Refractories, Durabla Manufacturing Co., Ericsson, Inc., Fairmont Supply Company, General Refractories Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Grefco, Inc., Greene Tweed & Co., Guard-Line, Inc,, The Edward R. Hart Company, Insul Company Inc., M.V.S. Company, The Mau-Sherwood Supply Company, The Marmon Group, Inc., Mobil Oil Corporation, Nitro Industrial Coverings Inc., Norton Company, Oglebay Norton Company, Ohio Pipe & Supply Company Incorporated, Ohio Valley Insulating Company Inc., Okonite Incorporated, Osram Sylvania, Inc., Pittsburgh Metals Purifying Co., Record Industrial Company, Robertson-Ceco Corp., Rockbestos Suprenant Cable Corp., Rockwell International Corp., Treco Construction Services, Inc., Safety First Industries, Inc., The Sager Corporation, Tasco Insulations, Inc, Theim Corporation, Union Boiler Company, Uniroyal Inc., Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division, Universal Refractories, Wheeler Protective Apparel Corp., Zurn Industries, Inc., Flexo Products, Inc., American Optical Corporation, Amchem Products, Inc., C.E. Thurston & Sons, Inc., CertainTeed Corporation, Union Carbide Corp., Dana Corporation, Quigley Company, Inc., I.U. North America, Inc., C.P. Hall Company, Red Seal Electric, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Sealed Air Corporation, Maremont Corporation, Combustion Engineering, Inc., (1 - 100) John Does. Related document(s) #1 . (Evanchan, Nicholas)
October 20, 2014 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Norton Company. (Jones, Daniel)
October 20, 2014 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Daniel L. Jones filed by on behalf of Norton Company. (Jones, Daniel)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 10/20/2014. (D,M)
October 17, 2014 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Greg White. (C,B)
October 17, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler, LLC for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Evanchan, Nicholas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 492051 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-6785574.. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit C - Hagen, #5 Exhibit D - Leite, #6 Exhibit E - Ruppel, #7 Exhibit F - Citrano, #8 Exhibit G - Hicks, #9 Exhibit H - Perkins, #10 Exhibit I - Fellows, #11 Exhibit J - Schroppe Affidavit, #12 Exhibit K - Lehman Affidavit) (Evanchan, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maclachlan et al v. 3M et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Refractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (1 - 100) John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osram Sylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Reginald S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Wade A. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corporation
Represented By: Reginald S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quigley Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. Hall Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oglebay Norton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Hart Company
Represented By: Bruce P. Mandel
Represented By: James N. Kline
Represented By: Kurt S. Siegfried
Represented By: Robert E. Zulandt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson-Ceco Corp.
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okonite Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corhart Refractories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Record Industrial Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Represented By: Diane L. Feigi
Represented By: Edward D. Papp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMI Refractory Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Air Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treco Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Represented By: Timothy J. Green
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hersh Packing & Rubber Co.
Represented By: William D. Bonezzi
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Kevin O. Kadlec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas L. Evanchan, Jr.
Represented By: Ralph J. Palmisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Co
Represented By: Brad A Rimmel
Represented By: Susan Squire Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexo Products, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Bonezzi
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Kevin O. Kadlec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mau-Sherwood Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grefco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theim Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Pipe & Supply Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insul Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart J. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Protective Apparel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.V.S. Company
Represented By: William D. Bonezzi
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Kevin O. Kadlec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmont Supply Company
Represented By: Reginald S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Scott J. Wilkov
Represented By: Karen E. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D. Silvaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Industrial Insulation Co.
Represented By: John A. Kristan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combustion Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh Metals Purifying Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Fiber & Textile Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George V. Hamilton, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D. Silvaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety First Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Glove Corporation
Represented By: Bradley K. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard-Line, Inc,
Represented By: John A. Kristan, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasco Insulations, Inc
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Bruce P. Mandel
Represented By: James N. Kline
Represented By: Kurt S. Siegfried
Represented By: Robert E. Zulandt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adience, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.E. Thurston & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNO. J. Disch Co.
Represented By: Carol K. Metz
Represented By: Theodore M. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos Suprenant Cable Corp.
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Seal Electric
Represented By: John A. Kristan, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Valley Insulating Company Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Mandel
Represented By: James N. Kline
Represented By: Kurt S. Siegfried
Represented By: Robert E. Zulandt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U B West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Represented By: Kevin O. Kadlec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corp.
Represented By: Timothy M. Fox
Represented By: Christine E. Watchorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nitro Industrial Coverings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Boiler Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley K. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marmon Group, Inc.
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sager Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Refractories
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen H. Daniels
Represented By: James A. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell International Corp.
Represented By: Michael A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durabla Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B. Wright Company of Pittsburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey Hayes Company
Represented By: Diane L. Feigi
Represented By: Edward D. Papp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Maclachlan
Represented By: Anthony Gallucci
Represented By: John A. Sivinski
Represented By: Ryan J. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Maclachlan
Represented By: Anthony Gallucci
Represented By: John A. Sivinski
Represented By: Ryan J. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?