Goodwin v. City of Cleveland, Ohio et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Goodwin
Defendant: City of Cleveland, Ohio, Scott Aldridge and Bryan Myers
Case Number: 1:2015cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2015
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C. Nugent
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum and Order that Defendants Scott Aldrich and Bryan Myers' 77 Motion for extension of time until September 28, 2016, to answer is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 9/6/16. (M,De)
May 4, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order . Plaintiff and Defendants' motions 41 and 47 are hereby granted in part and denied in part. The Court finds that the plaintiff's position will not be prejudiced by an additional short delay to, hopefully, allow for the completion of the criminal investigation. However, if the investigation is not complete by September 1. 2016, the stay will lift automatically and Officers Aldridge and Meyers will be required to file their responsive pleadings no later than September 14, 2016. Judge Donald C. Nugent 5/4/16(C,KA)
April 20, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying 39 Cuyahoga County Sheriff's Office's Motion to quash Plaintiff's subpoena and for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 4/20/16. (M,De)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. City of Cleveland, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Goodwin
Represented By: Jennifer L. Branch
Represented By: Sara M. Gedeon
Represented By: Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
Represented By: David B. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?