Hudson Medical Systems, Inc. v. Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hudson Medical Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc, Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk, ChartNet Technologies, Inc., John Does 1-10 and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv00265
Filed: February 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 05:75
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2015 Filing 30 Consent Judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants Keystrokes and Chartnet, jointly and severally, in the amount of $1,800,000.00. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/1/15. (P,R)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal. Plaintiff hereby dismisses its claims, with prejudice against the Internal Revenue Service, and Defendants Jeffrey Tkachuk and Lee Tkachuk. All Defendants dismiss their counterclaims against Plaintiff with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to ensure that the settlement agreement is executed. Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (G,CA)
August 24, 2015 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Settlement Conference held 8/24/15 with the parties and counsel of record. Plaintiff dismisses with prejudice claims against IRS, Jeffrey Tkachuk and Lee Tkachuk. All defendants dismiss counterclaims with prejudice. Consent Judgment to be submitted as to defendants Charnet and Keystrokes. Time: 1 hr. (P,R)
July 1, 2015 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Case Management Conference held on 7/1/15. The Court engaged the parties in settlement discussions. Mediation Conference set for 8/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Respresentatives with settlement authority from of each party shall attend. The parties are to work in advance of the conference to try to resolve the case. There is to be no discovery in the meantime. The parties' joint submission is due to the Court by 4:00 PM on 8/18/15.Time: 2 hrs. (P,R)
June 29, 2015 Notice [non-document] - 7/1/2015 Case management conference reset for 10:30 AM (change of time only). (P,R)
June 29, 2015 Filing 28 Initial Disclosures filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #23 .(Bennett, James)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting USA's Motion to excuse appearance of IRS Representative from Case Management Conference (Related Doc #26 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/29/15.(P,R)
June 28, 2015 Filing 27 Initial Disclosures filed by ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., John Does 1-10, Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk. Related document(s) #23 .(Wilson, James)
June 26, 2015 Filing 26 Motion to excuse appearance of IRS Representative from Case Management Conference filed by Defendant United States of America. Related document(s) #23 . (Bennett, James)
June 23, 2015 Filing 25 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bloom, Douglas)
June 3, 2015 Notice [non-document] - 7/1/2015 Case management conference reset for 9:45 AM (change of time only). (P,R)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion to continue (Related Doc #24 ). Case management conference rescheduled for 7/1/2015 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/27/15.(P,R)
May 26, 2015 Filing 24 Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., John Does 1-10, Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk, ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk. Related document(s) #23 . (Wilson, James)
May 22, 2015 Filing 23 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 6/23/2015 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/22/15. (P,R)
May 21, 2015 Filing 22 Answer filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #20 , #1 . (Bennett, James)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney James S. Schoen removed from case (Related Doc #19 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/8/2015.(K,K)
May 7, 2015 Filing 20 Response to #17 Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Federal Tax Lien)(Bloom, Douglas)
May 7, 2015 Filing 19 Motion by James Schoen to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Hudson Medical Systems, Inc.. (Bloom, Douglas)
April 30, 2015 Notice to Attorney James S. Schoen. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #18 . (P,G)
April 29, 2015 Filing 18 Answer to #9 Counterclaim, filed by Hudson Medical Systems, Inc.. (Bloom, Douglas) Modified text on 4/30/2015 (H,SP).
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting USA's Motion for a More Definite Statement (Related Doc #17 ). Plaintiff shall provide a more definite statement of its claims against the United States by no later than 5/11/15. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/27/15.(P,R)
April 24, 2015 Filing 17 Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Defendant United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Bennett, James)
April 24, 2015 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by James R. Bennett, II filed by on behalf of United States of America. (Bennett, James)
April 14, 2015 Filing 15 Return of Service by Counsel by certified mail executed upon United States of America on 2/23/2015, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bloom, Douglas) Modified on 4/15/2015 to service by Counsel (H,SP).
April 14, 2015 Filing 14 Return of Service by Counsel by certified mail executed upon United States of America c/o Attorney General on 3/3/2015, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bloom, Douglas). Modified on 4/15/2015 to change serve by Counsel (H,SP).
April 14, 2015 Filing 13 Return of Service by Counsel by certified mail executed upon Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr. on 3/4/2015, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bloom, Douglas). Modified on 4/15/2015 to service by Counsel (H,SP).
April 14, 2015 Filing 12 Return of Service by Counsel by certified mail executed upon Lee M. Tkachuk on 2/25/2015, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bloom, Douglas). Modified on 4/15/2015 to note service by Counsel (H,SP).
April 14, 2015 Filing 11 Return of Service by Counsel by certified mail executed upon Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., no date of service indicated on green card, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bloom, Douglas). Modified on 4/15/2015 to remove service date (H,SP).
April 14, 2015 Filing 10 Return of Service by Counsel by certified mail executed upon ChartNet Technologies, Inc., no date of service indicated on green card, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bloom, Douglas). Modified on 4/15/2015 to remove service date, green card is also Not Signed (H,SP).
April 14, 2015 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, Counterclaim against Hudson Medical Systems, Inc. filed by Lee M. Tkachuk, ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr.. (Wilson, James) Modified text on 4/15/2015 (H,SP).
March 20, 2015 Filing 8 Stipulation & Order That defendants have until April 15, 2015 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/20/15 (G,CA). Modified text on 3/24/2015 (H,SP).
March 19, 2015 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Response Date filed by ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk. Related document(s) #1 .(Wilson, James)
March 18, 2015 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc.. (Wilson, James)
March 18, 2015 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ChartNet Technologies, Inc.. (Wilson, James)
March 18, 2015 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by James D. Wilson and Aanchal Soni filed by on behalf of ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk. (Wilson, James)
February 19, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hudson Medical Systems, Inc.. (Bloom, Douglas)
February 10, 2015 Notice by Clerk that Hudson Medical Systems, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (H,SP)
February 10, 2015 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon ChartNet Technologies, Inc., Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr., Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc., Lee M. Tkachuk, United States of America (2 addresses). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (C,B)
February 10, 2015 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. (C,B)
February 10, 2015 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (C,B)
February 10, 2015 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-6952142. Filed by Hudson Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit Guaranty, #5 Exhibit UCC Filings, #6 Exhibit Notice of Breach, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Bloom, Douglas) Modified descriptions of attachments, to remove duplicate text, on 2/10/2015 (C,B).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Medical Systems, Inc. v. Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey M. Tkachuk, Sr.
Represented By: James D. Wilson
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystrokes Transcription Service, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Wilson
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee M. Tkachuk
Represented By: James D. Wilson
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChartNet Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Wilson
Represented By: Aanchal Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Bloom
Represented By: Craig W. Relman
Represented By: James S. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?