Jackson v. Cleveland et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Jackson
Defendant: City of Cleveland, Estate of Eugene Terpay, Estate of James T. Farmer, Estate of John Staimpel, Estate of Peter Comodeca, Frank Stoiker, James White, (FNU) Engelhart, Michael Cummings and Unknown Current or Former Employees of the City of Cleveland
Case Number: 1:2015cv00989
Filed: May 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Opinion and Order. Defendant City of Cleveland's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related doc # 101 ) is granted. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/4/2017. (H,CM)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, or in the alternative, to Certify Interlocutory Appeal or Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) on Claims against Administrator of Estates (Related doc # 85 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/10/2016. (H,CM)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Opinion and Order granting Defendant City of Cleveland's Motion for judgment on the pleadings on Counts 7 through 11 of the First Amended Complaint (Related Doc # 60 ). Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 14 days of this Or der reflecting the dismissal of Counts 7 through 11, as well as the voluntary dismissal of Defendant Michael Cummings and Defendant James White (ECF DKT ##79 & 80) and the substitution of Karen Lamendola, Guardian ad Litem for Defendant Frank Stoiker (Non-document Order of 8/25/2015). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/20/2016.(R,D) Modified text on 7/22/2016. (S,S)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Related doc # 68 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/30/2016. (H,CM)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Opinion and Order. Defendants Estate of Eugene Terpay, Estate of James Farmer, Estate of John Staimpel and Estate of Peter Comodeca's Motion to Dismiss (Related doc # 37 ) is granted and First Amended Complaint is dismissed against the Estate Defendants without prejudice. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/20/2015. (H,CM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cleveland
Represented By: Alejandro V. Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Eugene Terpay
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James T. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of John Staimpel
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Peter Comodeca
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Stoiker
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (FNU) Engelhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Current or Former Employees of the City of Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Jackson
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?