United States of America v. $16,765.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Assorted Silver, Gold, Diamonds and Pearls, $79,270.73, $27,290.56, Permanent Parcel #20A031B000170, VIN 1FTFW1EF2BFA12761, $5,093.16, $5,276.85, VIN 4XAWH9EA2EB181985, VIN 2HNYD2H64AH533150, $27,026.84, VIN WP0AD2A70DL045122, $7,333.28, $2,111.59, $33,827.00 in U.S. Currency, $81,253.76, $5,266.41, VIN 5N3AA08C69N901781, $9,838.60, $4,013.40, $6,442.98, $5,924.42, $6,300.46, VIN 1FT8W3BT8BEB91618, $26,989.51, $147,698.30, $1,324,690.90, Assorted Jewely, $71,110.29, $7,876.62, $209,793.14, $65,386.20, $89,257.31, $2,801.30, $16,765.00 in U.S. Currency, $24,239.28, $106,017.74, VIN 1FTFW1R67EFB15902, $483,078.93, $6,500.20 and $5,583.30
Claimant: Roberta Eldridge, DAS Funding Group, Inc., Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc., DAS Motor, LLC, Brandon K. Selvaggio, Dominic Schender, Gabriel J. Saluan and Iris Karina Baker
Case Number: 1:2015cv01036
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 86 Motion for extension of presettlement conference demand until June 5, 2019 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting United States of America's #86 Motion to extend time until 6/5/2019 to comply with presettlement conference demand requirement. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/3/2019.(H,CM)
June 2, 2019 Filing 85 Attorney Appearance by Harvey B. Bruner filed by on behalf of $1,324,690.90, $106,017.74, $147,698.30, $2,111.59, $2,801.30, $209,793.14, $26,989.51, $27,290.56, $33,827.00 in U.S. Currency, $483,078.93, $7,333.28, $7,876.62, $79,270.73, $81,253.76, $89,257.31, $9,838.60, Assorted Jewely, Assorted Silver, Gold, Diamonds and Pearls, DAS Funding Group, Inc., DAS Motor, LLC, Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc., Roberta Eldridge, Dominic Schender. (Bruner, Harvey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 84 Settlement Conference Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/31/2019. (H,CM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 83 Marshal's Asset Return on 15-DEA-610577 filed by United States of America. Returned $27,026.84 to owner on 5/20/2019. (S,KM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 82 Marshal's Asset Return on 15-DEA-609504 filed by United States of America. Returned $5,924.42 to owner on 5/20/2019. (S,KM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 81 Marshal's Asset Return on 15-DEA-609503 filed by United States of America. Returned $5,276.85 to owner on 5/20/2019. (S,KM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 80 Marshal's Asset Return on 15-DEA-609500 filed by United States of America. Returned $5,583.30 on 5/20/2019. (S,KM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 79 Marshal's Asset Return on 15-DEA-609498 filed by United States of America.Returned $6,500.20 on 5/20/2019 (S,KM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 78 Marshal's Asset Return on 15-DEA-609076 filed by United States of America. Returned $6,442.98 on 5/20/2019 (S,KM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 77 Notice of Production of Discovery filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
April 19, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of Service of First Request for Production of Documents upon Plaintiff filed by Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc.. (Weintraub, Craig)
April 11, 2019 Filing 75 Separate Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Brandon K. Selvaggio. (Yelsky, Mitchell)
April 4, 2019 Filing 74 Attorney Appearance by Brad S. Wolfe filed by on behalf of Iris Karina Baker. (Wolfe, Brad)
April 4, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Phillip J. Tripi_AUSA and adding attorney filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
April 4, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Status Conference held on 4/4/2019. Per Government's request, the stay on discovery is lifted. Case Management Conference/Settlement Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 15B. All parties with full settlement authority must attend in person. Settlement Conference Order to issue. Claimant Selvaggio's oral motion for leave to file Answer is granted; Claimant shall file Answer by 4/12/2019. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 15 min.) (H,CM)
February 4, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Status Conference held on 2/4/2019. Attorneys only Status Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 10 min.) (H,CM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 72 Attorney Appearance by Eric F. Long filed by on behalf of Irina Karina Baker. (Long, Eric) Modified filer on 2/4/2019 (M,S).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 01/09/2019. (M,TL)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (L,Ja)
December 3, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Telephone Status Conference held on 12/3/2018. Government to provide upon request limited discovery as discussed. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 11:00 AM. Government to provide call information to Court and claimants' counsel. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 20 min.) (H,CM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 71 Judgment Entry granting Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss certain Defendant properties from Complaint without prejudice (Related doc #70 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/9/2018. (H,CM) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (M,S).
November 8, 2018 Filing 70 Motion to dismiss party Certain Defendant Properties from Complaint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss Certain Defendant Properties from Complaint)(Tripi, Phillip)
September 27, 2018 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko.Phone Case Management Conference held on 9/27/2018. Case is assigned to the complex track. Government to provide limited discovery as discussed at phone conference. Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 02:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Government to initiate call with Claimants and contact Court at 216-357-7151. Parties shall be prepared to discuss maintaining case on the active docket when discovery is so limited.Time: 20 minutes. (R,D)
September 25, 2018 Filing 69 Motion to excuse appearance at September 27, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by Claimant Gabriel J. Saluan. (Vitantonio, Dominic) Modified text on 9/25/2018 (M,S).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Claimants Dominic Schender and Roberta Eldridge's Motion to excuse appearance (Related Doc #68 ); granting Claimant Gabriel Saluan's Motion to excuse appearance (Related Doc #69 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/25/2018.(H,CM)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 10:00 AM will be telephonic. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate conference with opposing counsel and contact the Court at 216-357-7151. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/25/2018. (H,CM)
September 24, 2018 Filing 68 Motion to excuse appearance at September 27, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by Claimant Dominic Schender, Roberta Eldridge. (Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 9/25/2018 (M,S).
September 21, 2018 Filing 67 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip)
August 23, 2018 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2016-3. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (D,Ky)
August 21, 2018 Filing 66 Notice of Case Management Conference. Conference to be held on 9/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(H,CM)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) granting Plaintiff's request to allow stay of proceedings to expire (Related doc #65 ). Case returned to active docket. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/21/2018. (H,CM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 65 Request to Allow the Stay of Proceedings to Expire and to Set a Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order. The Court will continue the stay for another ninety days until 8/7/2018. If the Government's investigation is not concluded at that time, the Government shall show cause by 8/7/2018 why the stay should not be lifted and the case returned to the active docket. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/4/2018. (H,CM)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Stay is continued. The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/5/2018. (H,CM)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Stay is continued. The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/1/2017. (H,CM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Stay is continued. The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/15/2017. (H,CM)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Order (non-document). Stay is continued. The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/12/2017. (H,CM) Modified on 5/15/2017 (S,HR).
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Order (non-document). Stay is continued . The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/13/2017. (H,CM) Modified on 5/15/2017 (S,HR).
September 19, 2016 Filing 56 Attorney Appearance for Claimant Brandon Selvaggio by Mitchell J. Yelsky filed by on behalf of Brandon K. Selvaggio. (Yelsky, Mitchell)
September 19, 2016 Filing 55 Attorney Appearance for Claimant Brandon Selvaggio by Angelo F. Lonardo filed by on behalf of Brandon K. Selvaggio. (Lonardo, Angelo)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Order (non-document). Stay is continued. The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/18/2016. (H,CM) Modified on 5/15/2017 (S,HR).
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order. Claimant Brandon Selvaggio's Motion to Lift the Stay (Related Doc #50 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/26/2016.(H,CM)
July 15, 2016 Filing 52 Reply in support of #50 Motion to lift stay for limited purpose of filing and consideration of motion to unseal affidavits. by Brandon Selvaggio filed by Brandon K. Selvaggio. (Marshall, Laura) Modified text on 7/18/2016 (P,G).
July 12, 2016 Filing 51 Brief in Opposition to #50 Motion to lift stay to permit the filing of a motion to unseal affidavits filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip) Modified text on 7/13/2016 (P,G).
June 28, 2016 Filing 50 Motion to lift stay filed by Brandon Selvaggio. Related document(s) #46 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Unseal Affidavits, #2 Proposed Order to Lift Stay)(Marshall, Laura) Modified text on 6/30/2016 (P,G).
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Brandon Selvaggio's Motion for attorney Laura C. Marshall to appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #49 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/6/2016.(H,CM)
June 3, 2016 Filing 49 Motion for attorney Laura C. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660086712, filed by Edward LaRue, on behalf of Claimant Brandon K. Selvaggio. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura C. Marshall, #2 Virginia State Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(C,KA)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Order (non-document). Stay is continued (Related doc # 48 ). The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/17/2016. (H,CM)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Order (non-document). Stay is continued (Related doc # 47 ). The Government to file ex parte status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/16/2016. (H,CM)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order. Government's Motion to Stay (Related doc #36 ) is granted and the Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss (Related doc #'s #20 , #41 , #42 , #43 ) are denied as moot, subject to refiling upon the reopening of the case. The Government to file a status report to the Court every ninety days on the progress of the criminal investigation focusing on why the forfeiture action should remain stayed. Case is removed the active docket until the matter is reopened by motion of the parties. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/9/2015. (H,CM)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (Related Doc #36 ) is granted. The Government shall provide an ex parte status report every 90 days while the case is stayed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/2/2015.(H,CM)
October 27, 2015 Filing 45 Notice of Ex Parte Filing of Brief filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip)
October 27, 2015 FILING ERROR filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip) Modified on 10/27/2015 (O,K).
October 21, 2015 Filing 43 Motion to dismiss $33,847.00 US Currency and jewelry filed by Claimant Roberta Eldridge. Related document(s) #40 , #1 . (Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 10/23/2015 (P,G).
October 21, 2015 Filing 42 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(B)(6) filed by Claimant Dominic Schender. Related document(s) #40 , #1 . (Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 10/23/2015 (P,G).
October 21, 2015 Filing 41 Motion to dismiss Defendants $1,324,640.90 and $27,026.84, for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant $1,324,690.90. Related document(s) #40 , #1 . (Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 10/23/2015 (P,G).
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order. Claimant Iris Baker and Gabriel Saluan's Motions for Leave to File Amended Claims Instanter (Related doc #'s #21 , #22 ) are granted. Government's Motion to Strike Claims (Related doc #17 ) is denied as moot. Claimant Dominic Schender, DTS, DAS Funding, DAS Motor and Roberta Eldridge's Motions to Dismiss (Related doc #'s #10 , #11 , #12 ) are denied at this time subject to refiling. Government to provide additional evidence in support of its Motion to Stay within fourteen days. The Court holds in abeyance responses to pending Motions to Dismiss and discovery requests until the Court rules on Motion to Stay. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/13/2015.(H,CM)
August 20, 2015 Filing 39 Answer to Complaint in Forfeiture and Affirmative Defenses filed by Iris Karina Baker. (Friedman, Ian) Modified text on 8/24/2015 (P,G).
August 12, 2015 Filing 38 Opposition to #36 Motion to stay case filed by Dominic Schender. (Weintraub, Craig)
July 30, 2015 Filing 37 Amended Verified Claim of Iris Karina Baker filed by Iris Karina Baker. (Friedman, Ian)
July 28, 2015 Filing 36 Motion to stay case filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order for Stay)(Tripi, Phillip)
July 27, 2015 Filing 35 Notice of Service of Defendant's Request for Production of Documents upon Plaintiff filed by Dominic Schender. (Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 34 Notice of Service of United States of America's First Set of Special Interrogatories to Claimant Roberta Eldridge filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip)
July 20, 2015 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc.. (Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DAS Motor, LLC. (Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DAS Funding Group, Inc.. (Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 30 FILING ERROR BLANK DOCUMENT. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc.. (Weintraub, Craig) Modified on 7/21/2015 to note document is blank (P,G).
July 20, 2015 Filing 29 FILING ERROR BLANK DOCUMENT. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DAS Motor, LLC. (Weintraub, Craig) Modified on 7/21/2015 to note document is blank (P,G).
July 20, 2015 Filing 28 FILING ERROR BLANK DOCUMENT. Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DAS Funding Group, Inc.. (Weintraub, Craig) Modified on 7/21/2015 to note document is blank (P,G).
July 20, 2015 Filing 27 First Amended Verified Claim of Discounted Telecommunication Services, Inc. filed by Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Corp.)(Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 26 First Amended Verified Claim of Dominic Schender filed by Dominic Schender. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Corp., #2 Exhibit List of Defendants)(Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 25 First Amended Verified Claim of DAS Motor, LLC filed by DAS Motor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LLC Docs)(Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 24 First Amended Verified Claim of DAS Funding Group, LLC filed by DAS Funding Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Inc.)(Weintraub, Craig)
July 20, 2015 Filing 23 First Amended Verified Claim of Roberta Eldridge filed by Roberta Eldridge. (Weintraub, Craig)
July 17, 2015 Filing 22 Motion for leave to File Amended Verified Claim of Gabriel J. Saluan, Instanter filed by Claimant Gabriel J. Saluan. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Amended Verified Claim of Gabriel J. Saluan)(Vitantonio, Dominic) Modified text on 7/20/2015 (P,G).
July 17, 2015 Filing 21 Motion for leave to file an amended verified claim filed by Claimant Iris Karina Baker. (Friedman, Ian) Modified text on 7/20/2015 (P,G).
July 17, 2015 Filing 20 Motion to dismiss Complaint in Forfeiture Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Claimant Brandon Selvaggio. (LaRue, Edward) Modified text on 7/20/2015 (P,G).
July 14, 2015 Filing 19 Amended Verified Claim of Defendant Brandon K. Selvaggio filed by $16,765.00 in U.S. Currency. (LaRue, Edward)
July 10, 2015 Filing 18 Brief in Opposition to #10 , #11 , #12 Motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim and to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Tripi, Phillip) Modified text on 7/14/2015 (P,G).
July 10, 2015 Filing 17 Motion to strike Claims of all Claimants filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s) #14 , #13 , #9 , #16 , #15 . (Tripi, Phillip)
June 30, 2015 Filing 16 Verified Claim filed by Iris Karina Baker . (Friedman, Ian) Modified filer on 7/6/2015 (P, S).
June 30, 2015 Filing 15 Verified Claim of Defendant Brandon K. Selvaggio (LaRue, Edward) Modified text on 7/1/2015 (P,G).
June 29, 2015 Filing 14 Verified Claim of Schender Claimants Related document(s) #10 , #11 .(Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 7/1/2015 (P,G).
June 29, 2015 Filing 13 Verified Claim of Roberta Eldridge Related document(s) #12 .(Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 7/1/2015 (P,G).
June 29, 2015 Filing 12 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Claimant Roberta Eldridge (Weintraub, Craig) Modified filers on 7/1/2015 (P,G).
June 29, 2015 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant $1,324,690.90, $27,026.84, Claimant Dominic Schender (Weintraub, Craig) Modified text on 7/1/2015 (P,G).
June 29, 2015 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Claimants, Dominic Schender, Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc., DAS Funding Group, Inc. and DAS Motor, LLC, (Weintraub, Craig) Modified filers on 7/6/2015 (P, S).
June 12, 2015 Filing 9 Verified Claim filed Gabriel J. Saluan Related document(s) #1 . (Vitantonio, Dominic) Modified text on 6/12/2015 (H,KR). Modified filer on 7/6/2015 (P, S).
June 12, 2015 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by $6,300.46, $65,386.20, $71,110.29, VIN 2HNYD2H64AH533150. (Vitantonio, Dominic)
June 4, 2015 Filing 7 2 US Marshal returns of service of post and walk process upon real property at 10640 Bayshire Trail, Kirtland Ohio on 6/2/15 filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #4 .(C,KA)
June 4, 2015 Filing 6 Marshal's Returned and Executed Warrant of Arrest in Rem on 5/27/15. USMS N/OH took custody of asset 15-DEA Nos. 608442,608610,608613,608448,609133,609498,609500,609503,608533,608531,608534,609504 deposited into the SADF Related document(s) #3 . (E,P) Modified to add attachments and correct numbers on 6/4/2015 (E,P). #1 Main Document) (E,P). Modified to correct numbers on 6/8/2015 (P, S).
June 4, 2015 Filing 5 Marshal's Returned and Executed Warrant of Arrest in Rem on 5/27/2015. USMS N/OH took custody of asset, 15-DEA Nos. 608371, deposited into the SADF . Related document(s) #3 . (W,CM) Modified text on 6/4/2015 (E,P).
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Publication of Notice. (Related doc #2 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/27/2015.(H,CM)
May 22, 2015 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of a Warrant of Arrest in REM to the US Marshal's Service filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Warrant (Issued), #2 Asset Description, #3 U.S. Marshal Form, #4 Asset Description)(C,BA)
May 22, 2015 Filing 2 Motion for publication of notice filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(C,BA)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notices (Issued)) (C,BA)
May 22, 2015 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Greg White. (C,BA)
May 22, 2015 Magistrate Consent Form issued at time of filing. (C,BA)
May 22, 2015 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (C,BA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $16,765.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Silver, Gold, Diamonds and Pearls
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $79,270.73
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,290.56
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permanent Parcel #20A031B000170
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN 1FTFW1EF2BFA12761
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,093.16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,276.85
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN 4XAWH9EA2EB181985
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN 2HNYD2H64AH533150
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Represented By: Dominic J. Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,026.84
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN WP0AD2A70DL045122
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,333.28
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,111.59
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,827.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $81,253.76
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,266.41
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN 5N3AA08C69N901781
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,838.60
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,013.40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,442.98
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,924.42
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,300.46
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Represented By: Dominic J. Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN 1FT8W3BT8BEB91618
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $26,989.51
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $147,698.30
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,324,690.90
Represented By: Craig T. Weintraub
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Jewely
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $71,110.29
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Represented By: Dominic J. Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,876.62
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $209,793.14
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $65,386.20
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Represented By: Dominic J. Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $89,257.31
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,801.30
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,765.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,239.28
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $106,017.74
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIN 1FTFW1R67EFB15902
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $483,078.93
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,500.20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,583.30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Roberta Eldridge
Represented By: Craig T. Weintraub
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: DAS Funding Group, Inc.
Represented By: Craig T. Weintraub
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Discounted Telecommunication Services Inc.
Represented By: Craig T. Weintraub
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: DAS Motor, LLC
Represented By: Craig T. Weintraub
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brandon K. Selvaggio
Represented By: Angelo F. Lonardo
Represented By: Mitchell J. Yelsky
Represented By: Laura C. Marshall
Represented By: Edward R. LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dominic Schender
Represented By: Craig T. Weintraub
Represented By: Harvey B. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gabriel J. Saluan
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Represented By: Dominic J. Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Iris Karina Baker
Represented By: Eric F. Long
Represented By: Brad S. Wolfe
Represented By: Ian N. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi_AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?