October 31, 2017 |
Filing
144
Memorandum and Order granting in part and denying in part 138 Plaintiff's Motion for partial summary judgment. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/31/2017. (G,W)
|
November 22, 2016 |
Filing
104
Memorandum and Order denying 92 Plaintiff's Motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement and Motion for sanctions. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 11/22/2016. (G,W)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing
87
Memorandum and Order that the plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration is Denied. Related Doc # 81 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 9/28/16. (M,De)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing
82
Memorandum and Order that a response to plaintiff's 81 Motion for Reconsideration to be filed within 14 days, which is due Tuesday, 9/20/2016, as instructed by the Court at the status conference held 9/6/16. The case management da tes are modified, as follows: The parties' initial disclosures are due no later than Tuesday, 9/20/2016. The discovery deadline is Wednesday, 11/30/2016. The dispositive motion deadline is Friday, 12/30/2016. The motion for protecti ve order (doc. 56 ), and the motion to strike same (doc. 58 ) are DENIED, although the parties are cautioned as to the appropriate behavior to be followed in the course of this litigation, as discussed at the 9/6/2016 conference, and as set forth in this order. The motions for sanctions (doc. 68 , and 69 ) are DENIED at this juncture, without prejudice to renew. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 9/7/16. (M,De)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
78
Memorandum and Order granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to compel discovery (Related Doc # 70 ); and denying Plaintiff's Motion to strike (Related Doc # 73 ). As to Plaintiff's Motion to compel, the Cour t will re-set the clock. Plaintiff Shell will be permitted to re-serve relevant interrogatories on the defendants. Plaintiff Shell will propound no more than twenty-five interrogatories (to each), which are reasonably calculated to lead to th e discovery of admissible evidence in this copyright infringement suit, and properly serve them on the defendants. The defendants must answer these interrogatories, or serve objections, within thirty days of the service of the interrogatories. Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(b)(2). The grounds for objecting to an interrogatory must be stated with specificity. Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(b)(4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 8/29/16. (M,De)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
77
Memorandum Opinion and Order that Defendant McAllister's motion to intervene (doc. 46 ) is DENIED as moot. Defendant Lautenschlager's motion for protective relief (doc. 49 ), Plaintiff Shells motion to strike (doc. 50 ), an d Defendant Lautenschlager's related motion to strike (doc. 54 ) are DENIED. The defendants' motions for summary judgment (doc. 47 , and 48 ) are DENIED, without prejudice to renew. Defendant McAllister's motion (doc. 53 ) to strike Shell' s response is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 8/24/16. (M,De)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
38
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/5/16 partially granting the motion of defendant Ray Lautenschlager for an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint. The Court orders Defendant Lautenschalger to file an answer to the complaint by 4/13/16, or risk an entry of default judgment. (Related Doc. 37 ) (D,MA)
|
March 25, 2016 |
Filing
36
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/25/16. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order and the order issued 3/22/16, finds the plaintiff properly served defendant Rosalind McAllister and denies said defendant's motion to dismiss for improper service. (Related Docs. 23 and 35 ) (D,MA)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
35
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/22/16. For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court grants the plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Opinion and Order issued 3/1/16 and finds that plaintiff perfected se rvice on defendant Rosalind McAllister. The Court also grants defendant Ray Lautenschlager's motion for reconsideration, finds that plaintiff properly served said defendant, and strikes defendants Ohio Family Rights and Ohio Family Rights Natio nal from the complaint as redundant. Finally, the Court orders that the parties comply with Rule 5 for service of future pleadings and motions and orders defendants Lautenschlager and McAllister to file an answer to the first amended complaint by 4/7/16. (Related Docs. 30 and 32 ) (D,MA)
|
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
29
Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/1/16. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants the plaintiff's motion to strike, denies the motion of defendant Ray Lautenschlager to dismiss, and orders re-service o n defendant Rosalind "Roz" McAllister. The plaintiff shall perfect service under Rule 4(e) on defendant McAllister within 30 days of the filing of this order or the complaint as to said defendant will be dismissed. (Related Docs. 24 , 25 , 26 , and 28 ) (D,MA)
|