Legrand v. Intellicorp Records, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherri Legrand
Defendant: Cato Corporation and Intellicorp Records, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv02091
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Filing 97 Transcript of Fairness Hearing held on 10/31/2017 before Judge Donald C. Nugent. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [4 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 7/26/2018. Redaction Request due 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2018. Related document(s) #96 . (G,He)
July 17, 2018 Filing 96 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form requested by Chelsea Croy Smith for proceedings held on 10/31/17 before Judge Nugent, Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Requested completion date: 7/20/18 (K,J)
January 26, 2018 Filing 95 Notice regarding Settlement filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
November 1, 2017 Filing 94 Judgment Entry. The Court orders that this Final Order shall constitute a final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 that is binding on the settling Parties and the Settlement Class. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/31/2017. (G,CA)
November 1, 2017 Filing 93 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for attorney fees, Costs, and Class Representative Service Award (Related Doc #87 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/31/17.(R,JM)
October 31, 2017 Filing 92 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Related Doc #89 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/31/17.(R,JM)
October 3, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice (non-document) of DATE CHANGE FOR FAIRNESS HEARING. The Fairness Hearing to be re-scheduled to be held on 10/31/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
August 30, 2017 Filing 91 Notice of Withdrawal of Joint Motion to Reset Final Fairness Hearing filed by Sherri Legrand. Related document(s) #90 .(Albanese, John)
August 14, 2017 Filing 90 Document Withdrawn, Refer to Document No. #91 Joint Motion to continue Final Fairness Hearing Date filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John) Modified text on 9/13/17 to note document withdrawn. (G,TH).
August 7, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice (non-document) of Re-Scheduled Fairness Hearing to be held on 10/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
August 2, 2017 Filing 89 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with IntelliCorp with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Albanese, #2 Declaration of Settlement Administrator, #3 Exhibit A to Admin Decl. - Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Admin Decl. - Opt Out, #5 Exhibit C to Admin Decl. - Copy of Objection, #6 Proposed Order)(Albanese, John) Modified text on 8/7/2017 (G,CA).
July 6, 2017 Filing 88 Letter of objection filed by Miguel Lopez. Related document(s) #72 #78 , #84 . (C,KA)
June 19, 2017 Filing 87 Motion for attorney fees , Costs, and Class Representative Service Awards by E. Michelle Drake filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Michelle Drake, #2 Exhibit A to Drake Decl. - Fee Records, #3 Exhibit B to Drake Decl. - Cost Records, #4 Exhibit C to Drake Decl. - Firm Resume, #5 Declaration of Sherri Legrand)(Drake, E.)
June 7, 2017 Filing 86 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Cato Corporation. (Messeloff, Daniel)
May 26, 2017 Filing 85 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration. Related Docs #11 , #76 , #77 . The motion is denied to the extent that it sought remand of Count One of the Amended Complaint. The motion for reconsideration also sought clarification of the type of dismissal ordered. It is granted in so far as the Court agrees that the dismissal of Count One should have been designated as without prejudice. The Court's previous Order issued on February 24, 2017 is hereby amended to reflect this designation. Judge Donald C. Nugent 5/26/17(C,KA)
May 3, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice (non-document) of Re-Scheduled Fairness Hearing to be held on 8/17/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
May 1, 2017 Final Approval Hearing to be held on 6/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Related document(s) #84 . (G,CA)
April 28, 2017 Filing 84 Preliminary Approval Order of proposed class action settlement between Plaintiff Legrand and IntelliCorp Records, Inc. Final Approval Hearing scheduled for 6/14/17 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 15A. Related doc #83 . Judge Donald C. Nugent 4/25/17. (C,KA) Modified to add hearing text on 5/1/2017 (G,CA).
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Intellicorp (Related Doc #83 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/25/17.(R,JM)
April 24, 2017 Filing 83 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with IntelliCorp Records, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Michelle Drake, #2 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Firm Resume)(Drake, E.) Modified text on 5/1/2017 (G,CA).
April 11, 2017 Filing 82 Joint Status Report regarding Settlement with IntelliCorp Records, Inc. filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
April 11, 2017 Filing 81 Reply in support of #77 Motion for reconsideration filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
April 4, 2017 Filing 80 Opposition to #77 Motion for reconsideration filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smith v. OSU)(Oswald, Suellen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 79 Address Change Notice by Jennifer A. Riley filed by on behalf of Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Riley, Jennifer)
March 23, 2017 Filing 78 Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement filed by Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Devata, Pamela)
March 21, 2017 Filing 77 Motion for reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. Related document(s) #76 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Easley v. Reserves Network Order)(Albanese, John)
February 24, 2017 Filing 76 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting defendants' Motion to dismiss count of the first amended complaint (Related Doc #52 ). Count One is dismissed. Consequently, plaintiff's motion for class certification in connection with this claim is denied as moot (Related Doc #56 ). (other related doc #85 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent 2/24/17(C,KA) added link 5/26/2017 (C,KA).
February 23, 2017 Filing 75 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Cato's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ferguson v. DirecTV)Related document(s) #52 .(Drake, E.)
February 13, 2017 Filing 74 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Class Cert filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Criddell v. Premier Healthcare)Related document(s) #56 .(Albanese, John)
February 9, 2017 Filing 73 Reply in support of #56 Motion for class certification filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
February 8, 2017 Filing 72 Joint Settlement Notice between Plaintiffs and IntelliCorp Records, Inc. filed by Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Devata, Pamela)
January 27, 2017 Filing 71 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A In Re: Michael's Stores, Inc.). Related document(s) #52 .(Oswald, Suellen) Modified duplicate text on 1/31/2017 (G,CA).
January 23, 2017 Filing 70 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Cato's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Syed Opinion, #2 Exhibit B - In re Horizon Opinion)Related document(s) #52 .(Albanese, John)
January 19, 2017 Filing 69 Opposition to #56 Motion for class certification filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lee v. The Hertz Corp., #2 Exhibit B Case v. Hertz Corp., #3 Exhibit C Boergert v. Kelly Services Inc., #4 Exhibit D Kirchner v. First Advantage, #5 Exhibit E Gunther v. DSW Inc., #6 Exhibit F Tyus v. USPS, #7 Exhibit G Hopkins v. Staffing Network, #8 Exhibit H Shoots v. IQor Holdings, #9 Exhibit I Nokchan v. Lyft, Inc., #10 Exhibit J Groshek v. Great Lakes Higher Edu., #11 Exhibit K Landrum v. Blackbird Enterprises, #12 Exhibit L Romberio v. Unumprovident, #13 Exhibit M In re Carpenter, #14 Exhibit N Reeb v. Ohio Dep't of Rehab, #15 Exhibit O Eddleman v. Jefferson County)(Oswald, Suellen)
January 12, 2017 Filing 68 Reply to response to #52 Motion to dismiss count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Groshek v. GL Higher Edu, #2 Exhibit B - Landrum v. Blackbird Enters, #3 Exhibit C - Nokchan v. Lyft, Inc, #4 Exhibit D - Gunther v. DSW, #5 Exhibit E - Shoots v. iQor, #6 Exhibit F - Hopkins v. Staffing Network, #7 Exhibit G - Tyrus v. USPS, #8 Exhibit H - Kirchner v. First Advantage, #9 Exhibit I - Boergert v. Kelly Servs, #10 Exhibit J - Case v. Hertz Corp., #11 Exhibit K - Lee v. Hertz, #12 Exhibit L - Woods v. Caremark, #13 Exhibit M Rodriguez v. El Toro Med.(Oswald, Suellen) Modified duplicate text on 1/17/2017 (G,CA).
January 5, 2017 Filing 67 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant Cato's #52 Motion to Dismiss count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Graham v Pyramid Healthcare, #2 Exhibit B - Rodriguez v El Toro Medical, #3 Exhibit C - Dougherty v BBSI, #4 Exhibit D - Connolly v Umpqua Bank)Related document(s) #54 .(Albanese, John) Modified to add link on 1/6/2017 (G,CA).
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order re #65 joint status report, extending discovery deadline until 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motion deadline is extended until 7/17/2017. Cato Corporation's response to #56 plaintiff's motion for class certification is due on 1/19/17, reply due 2/9/17. Judge Donald C. Nugent 12/6/16(C,KA)
December 7, 2016 Utility Event set/reset motion and R&R deadlines/hearings as to #56 Motion for class certification . Cato's response due 1/19/17; reply due by 2/9/2017.(C,KA)
December 1, 2016 Filing 65 Joint Status Report filed by Sherri Legrand. Related document(s) #64 .(Albanese, John)
October 28, 2016 Filing 64 Marginal Entry Order granting Joint Motion to stay Proceedings. Counsel shall contact the Court on or before 12/1/16 to give an update and status on case (Related Doc #63 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/27/16.(R,JM)
October 26, 2016 Filing 63 Joint Motion to stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order re Joint Motion to Stay)(Oswald, Suellen)
October 21, 2016 Filing 62 Reply to response to #39 Motion for protective order and Memorandum in Support, #37 Motion to stay All Discovery filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit case law)(Oswald, Suellen)
October 19, 2016 Filing 61 Notice of rescheduled status conference. Status originally scheduled for 11/15/16 has been rescheduled for 11/14/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Related document(s) #57 . (C,KA)
October 14, 2016 Filing 60 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Cato's Motion to Dismiss Count I of First Amended Complaint filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Meza v. Verizon, #2 Exhibit B - Moody v. Ascenda, #3 Exhibit C - Firneno v. Radner, #4 Exhibit D - Polo v. Innoventions, #5 Exhibit E - Am. Farm v. EPA, #6 Exhibit F - Perrill v. Equifax)Related document(s) #52 .(Albanese, John)
October 12, 2016 Filing 59 Joint Status Report Regarding Pending Motions and Case Schedule filed by Sherri Legrand. Related document(s) #58 .(Albanese, John)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the parties' Joint Motion to stay, but not limited to, all discovery and deadlines for briefs related to pending motions until October 12, 2016 to allow the parties time to engage in mediation. (Related Doc #58 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/23/2016.(R,Sh)
August 19, 2016 Filing 58 Joint Motion to stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messeloff, Daniel) Modified on 8/23/2016. s/ by Suellen Oswald. (G,CA).
August 18, 2016 Filing 57 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 8/16/16. Next Status Conference set for 11/15/2016 at 09:30 AM in to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Time: 20. (R,JM)
August 12, 2016 Filing 56 Motion for class certification filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Legrand Declaration, #2 Drake Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 - Selected Pages of Cato's Answers to Interrogatories Set I, #4 Exhibit 2 - Notice & Summary Docs, #5 Exhibit 3 - Selected Pages of Cato's Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit 4 - Berger Firm Resume)(Drake, E.) Modified exhibit text on 8/16/2016 (G,CA).
August 9, 2016 Filing 55 Response to #53 Motion for protective order and Motion to stay all discovery filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John) Modified text on 8/10/2016 (E,P).
August 9, 2016 Filing 54 Response to #52 Motion to dismiss count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing and Memorandum in Support filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Albanese Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Burke Memorandum Opinion)(Albanese, John)
July 26, 2016 Filing 53 Motion for protective order and Motion To Stay All Discovery filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. (Oswald, Suellen). Added Motion to stay event on 7/27/2016 (G,CA). Modified on 7/5/2017 (R,JM).
July 26, 2016 Filing 52 Motion to dismiss count I of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Standing and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. Related document(s) #11 . (Oswald, Suellen)
May 31, 2016 Filing 51 Amended Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge Donald C. Nugent 5/31/16(C,KA)
May 31, 2016 Filing 50 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 5/31/16. Next Status Conference is set for 8/16/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Time: 30 min. (R,JM)
May 27, 2016 Filing 49 Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Kozimor filed by on behalf of Cato Corporation. (Kozimor, Michael)
May 26, 2016 Filing 48 Amended Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John) Modified text 5/27/2016 (C,KA).
April 22, 2016 Filing 47 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #14 defendant Cato Corporation's Motion to dismiss first amended complaint (other related doc #9 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent 4/22/16(C,KA)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]denying Motion for protective order (Related Doc #39 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/20/16.(R,JM)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]denying Motion to stay (Related Doc #37 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/20/16.(R,JM)
April 18, 2016 Filing 46 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order] filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
April 14, 2016 Filing 45 Reply to response to #37 Motion to stay and Motion for Protective Order filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exibit A - Declaration of Shelly Hansen, #2 Exhibit B - Order in Romulus Albu v. The Home Depot, Inc.)(Oswald, Suellen)
April 8, 2016 Filing 44 Reply to response to #14 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shelly Hansen, #2 Exhibit Summary & Authorization)(Oswald, Suellen)
April 7, 2016 Filing 43 Marginal Entry Order denying Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc.'s Motion to stay Proceedings (Related Doc #35 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/7/16.(R,JM)
April 4, 2016 Filing 42 Opposition to #37 Motion to stay, #39 Motion for protective order and Memorandum in Support, #35 Motion to stay pending resolution of: (1) IntelliCorp's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike; and (2) the United States Supreme Court's decision in Spokeo, Inc. v. Robins and Motion for protective order filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Albanese, #2 Exhibit A - Taylor, #3 Exhibit B - Robins)(Albanese, John)
April 1, 2016 Filing 41 Opposition to #14 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Converted Motion for Summary Judgment, re #36 ) filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sherri Legrand, #2 Declaration of E. Michelle Drake pursuant to Rule 56(d))(Albanese, John) Modified text on 4/8/2016 (R,Sh).
April 1, 2016 Filing 40 Address Change Notice for E. Michelle Drake and John G. Albanese by E. Michelle Drake filed by on behalf of Sherri Legrand. (Drake, E.)
March 30, 2016 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Greg White. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,TL)
March 25, 2016 Filing 39 Motion for protective order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. Related document(s) #37 . (Oswald, Suellen)
March 24, 2016 Filing 38 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #13 Motion to strike Class Allegations in Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; and denying #13 Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/22/16. (G,CA)
March 22, 2016 Filing 37 Motion to stay filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Hillson v. Kelly, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Evers v. The JTX Companies, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Ramirez v. Trans Union, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Perrill v. Equifax)(Messeloff, Daniel)
March 18, 2016 Filing 36 Memorandum Opinion and Order re #14 defendant Cato Corporation's Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint.For the reasons set forth, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, [#9], is converted to a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff has fourteen days from the date of this opinion to respond to the converted motion and to address the documents attached to Defendants motion. Defendant will then have seven days to file a Reply, if appropriate. Judge Donald C. Nugent 3/18/16 (C,KA)
March 18, 2016 Filing 35 Motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of: (1) IntelliCorp's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike; and (2) the United States Supreme Court's decision in Spokeo, Inc. v. Robins, and Motion for protective order filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 NEF Case 1:15cv13071 District of Massachusetts)(Devata, Pamela). Added Motion for protective order on 3/21/2016 (G,CA).
March 7, 2016 Filing 34 Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Cato Corporation. Related document(s) #33 . (Oswald, Suellen)
March 1, 2016 Filing 33 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to the Cato Corporation's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Hertz Order)Related document(s) #14 , #21 .(Albanese, John) Modified text on 3/2/2016 (G,CA).
February 19, 2016 Filing 32 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Henderson Order)Related document(s) #13 , #19 .(Albanese, John)
February 10, 2016 Filing 31 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Case Management Conference held on 2/15/16. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery cut off date is 12/1/16. Motion cut off date to be determined. The next Status Conference is set for 5/31/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Time: 45 min. (R,JM)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kyle Anne Petersen for Intellicorp Records, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #29 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/09/16.(R,JM)
February 5, 2016 Filing 30 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
February 4, 2016 Filing 29 Motion for attorney Kyle Anne Petersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7468248, filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(Zbiegien, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Filing 28 Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplement Authority filed by Cato Corporation. Related document(s) #25 . (Oswald, Suellen)
January 20, 2016 Filing 27 Notice of Supplemental Authority in opposition to the Cato Corporation's motion to dismiss filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Robrinzine Order)Related document(s) #21 .(Albanese, John)
January 15, 2016 Filing 26 Notice of Firm Change for E. Michelle Drake and John G. Albanese filed by Sherri Legrand. (Drake, E.)
January 13, 2016 Filing 25 Supplemental Authority In Opposition to Intellicorp Records, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss/Strike filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Hawkins v. S2 Verify - Opinion)Related document(s) #21 , #19 .(Dooley, Matthew)
January 11, 2016 Filing 24 Reply in support of #13 Motion to strike Class Allegations in Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Motion to dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Sherrod v Enigma, #2 Exhibit 2 - Doe v Sterling, #3 Exhibit 3 - Section 1681k(a) legislative history, #4 Exhibit 4 - Section 1681k(a) legislative history, #5 Exhibit 5 - Section 1681k(a) legislative history, #6 Exhibit 6 -Section 1681k(a) legislative history, #7 Exhibit 7 - Section 1681k(a) legislative history, #8 Exhibit 8 - FTC advisory opinion, #9 Exhibit 9- FTC advisory opinion)(Devata, Pamela)
January 11, 2016 Filing 23 Reply to response to #14 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Cato Corporation. (Oswald, Suellen)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #22 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 1/11/16 to File Response/Reply to #13 motion to dismiss/strike. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/6/16. (R,JM) Modified text 1/8/2016 (C,KA).
December 30, 2015 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 11, 2016 to file response/reply to #13 Motion to strike Class Allegations in Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Motion to dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc. (Drury, John)
December 23, 2015 Filing 21 Opposition to #14 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
December 18, 2015 Filing 20 Affidavit/Declaration of John G. Albanese filed by Sherri Legrand. Related document(s) #19 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thomas v IntelliCorp, #2 Exhibit B - Roe v IntelliCorp)(Albanese, John)
December 18, 2015 Filing 19 Opposition to #13 Motion to strike Class Allegations in Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Motion to dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to continue (Related Doc #18 )case management conference to be held on 2/10/2016 at 9:00 AM before Judge Donald C. Nugent. All parties attending by telephone need to coordinate one call to the Chamber's main line. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/17/15.(R,JM)
December 14, 2015 Filing 18 Joint Motion to reset Case Management Conference and for parties and counsels appearance at CMC by telephone filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Albanese, John) Modified text on 12/15/2015 (G,CA).
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jennifer A. Riley for Intellicorp Records, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #16 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/07/15.(R,JM)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney John W. Drury for Intellicorp Records, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #17 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/07/15.(R,JM)
December 4, 2015 Filing 17 Motion for attorney John W. Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7384501, filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certficate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Wallace, David)
December 4, 2015 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7384479, filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Wallace, David)
December 1, 2015 Filing 15 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/27/2016 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (C,KA)
November 23, 2015 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Notice Regarding Consumer Reports, #3 Exhibit 12 C.F.R. 1022, Appendix K)(Messeloff, Daniel) Modified exhibit text on 11/24/2015 (G,CA).
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Pamela Q. Devata for Intellicorp Records, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/20/15.(R,JM)
November 18, 2015 Filing 13 Motion to strike Class Allegations in Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc. (Wallace, David). Added motion event on 11/19/2015 (G,CA).
November 18, 2015 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Pamela Q. Devata to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7363518, filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Wallace, David)
November 5, 2015 Filing 11 First Amended complaint against Cato Corporation, Intellicorp Records, Inc.. Filed by Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Report, #3 Exhibit C - Search Result, #4 Exhibit D - Search Result) (Drake, E.)
October 16, 2015 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Wallace, David)
October 15, 2015 Filing 9 Motion to strike Class Allegations in Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint, Motion to dismiss count III of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motions filed by Defendant Intellicorp Records, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FTC Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Williams v. First Advantage - SJ Opinion)(Wallace, David) Modified on 11/19/2015 (R,JM).
October 14, 2015 Filing 8 Supplement Redacted Exhibit A to #6 Answer to Complaint filed by Cato Corporation. Related document(s) #6 . (Messeloff, Daniel)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney E. Michelle Drake, Esq. for Sherri Legrand. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/14/15.(R,JM)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney John G. Albanese, Esq. for Sherri Legrand. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/14/15.(R,JM)
October 13, 2015 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cato Corporation. (Messeloff, Daniel)
October 13, 2015 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit A - refiled redacted version #8 )(Messeloff, Daniel S/Suellen Oswald) Modified text, restricted Exhibit A per counsel on 10/14/2015 (S,SR). Modified text 10/14/2015 (C,KA).
October 13, 2015 Filing 5 Motion for attorney John G. Albanese to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7309172, filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John G. Albanese)(Dooley, Matthew)
October 13, 2015 Filing 4 Motion for attorney E. Michelle Drake to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7309130, filed by Plaintiff Sherri Legrand. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit E. Michelle Drake)(Dooley, Matthew)
October 9, 2015 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (C,B)
October 9, 2015 Notice by Clerk that Intellicorp Records, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (C,B)
October 8, 2015 Filing 2 Amended Notice of Removal filed by Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Wallace, David)
October 8, 2015 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 15 850773 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-7305383.. Filed by Intellicorp Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records) (Wallace, David) Civil Cover Sheet and complaints filed as one PDF document (comes before complaint, pgs 1-3).Modified on 10/8/2015 (C,B).
October 8, 2015 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (C,B)
October 8, 2015 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Greg White. (C,B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legrand v. Intellicorp Records, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cato Corporation
Represented By: Suellen Oswald
Represented By: Daniel A. Messeloff
Represented By: Michael J. Kozimor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intellicorp Records, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Zbiegien, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Riley
Represented By: Pamela Q. Devata
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Represented By: Kyle Anne Petersen
Represented By: John W. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Legrand
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Represented By: Matthew A. Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?