Woodberry v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Simone Woodberry
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2015cv02222
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Presiding Judge: Greg White
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's motion for an attorney fee award pursuant to Section 406(b) is granted. When counsel for plaintiff receives the $6,545.00 awarded here under Section 406(b)(1), plaintiff's counsel shall remit the previously awarded Equal Access to Justice Act fee of $3,650.00 to plaintiff. (Related Doc. No. 25 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/5/2017. (P,J)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The parties' stipulation and petition for an award of Equal Access to Justice Act attorney fees pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2412 in the amount of $3,650.00 is granted. This amount shall be paid in accordance with the procedure outlined above. (Related Doc # 22 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 11/30/2016. (P,J) Modified text on 11/30/2016 (H,KR).
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Opinion and Order: The Court has reviewed Magistrate Judge Parker's report and recommendation, and accepts and adopts the same. (Doc. No. 17 .) Accordingly, the final decision of the Commissioner denying plaintiff's application for Supplemental Security Income benefits and Disability Insurance benefits is vacated, and this matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/26/2016. (P,J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodberry v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Woodberry
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?