Flight Options, LLC et al v. Local 1108 International Brotherhood of Teamsters et al
Plaintiff: Flight Options, LLC and Flexjet, LLC
Defendant: Local 1108 International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division and OneSky Flight, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00732
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/30/17. The Court denies Counter-Defendants Carriers' motion to stay and orders Counter-Plaintiffs Pilots Union to post a $10,500 bond for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Docs. 73 and 74 ) (D,MA)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/24/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants in part and denies in part Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Pilots Union's motion for contempt and grants in part and denies in part Pilots Union's motion for further injunctive relief. (Related Doc. 47 ) (D,MA)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/20/16. The Court orders the parties to file supplementary briefing regarding counter-plaintiffs Pilots Union's pending motion for contempt and further preliminary injunctive relief as set forth in this order. Briefs should be no more than 5 pages and shall be filed within 3 days of the date of this order. (Related Doc. 47 ) (D,MA)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/28/16 setting an injunction bond in the amount of $125,000.00 for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 45 ) (D,MA)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/6/16 denying defendants' applications for default judgment and denying defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' answer to the counterclaim for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Docs. 30 and 36 ) (D,MA)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/25/16. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants the motion of Counter-Plaintiffs International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division and Teamster Local Union 1108 for p reliminary injunction and orders Counter-Defendants Flight Options, LLC, Flexjet, LLC, Onesky Flight, LLC, and Flight Options Holdings I, Inc., to accept the integrated seniority list, rescind the voluntary separation package and bargain in good faith with Counter-Plaintiffs. (Related Doc. 10 ) (D,MA)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/6/16. For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court denies the motion to conduct broad expedited discovery, but allows Counter-Defendants to conduct one Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of an In ternational Brotherhood of Teamsters representative with knowledge of how the integrated seniority list was created. Further, the Court orders both parties to file summaries by close of business 5/10/16 not to exceed three pages explaining to this Court how seniority will operate under the integrated seniority list that the Counter-Plaintiffs Teamsters, et al presented to Counter-Defendants Flight Options, et al. (Related Doc. 14 ) (D,MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flight Options, LLC et al v. Local 1108 International Brotherhood of Teamsters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flight Options, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: W. Christopher Harrison
Represented By: Bruce G. Hearey
Represented By: Robert C. Petrulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flexjet, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: W. Christopher Harrison
Represented By: Bruce G. Hearey
Represented By: Robert C. Petrulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1108 International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Nicolas M. Manicone
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Trent R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Nicolas M. Manicone
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Trent R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Represented By: Nicolas M. Manicone
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Trent R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneSky Flight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?