Boring v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Boring and Audra Boring
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Express Insurance Company, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00869
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Stipulation & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/15/16 approving the parties' proposed stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. (Related Doc. #55 ) (D,MA)
December 15, 2016 Filing 55 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Audra Boring. (Bashein, W.)
December 14, 2016 Filing 54 FILING ERROR. Document is not PDF text searchable. Attorney to refile. Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Audra Boring. (Bashein, W.) Modified on 12/15/2016 (B,R).
November 22, 2016 Minute Order [non-document] of Mediation Conference. Mediation Conference held on 11/22/2016. Present for Plaintiff: Craig Bashein and John Hurst and Plaintiff Audra Boring by phone. Present for Defendant: Kevin Peinkofer and Jessica Blakeslee with Attorneys Kenneth Prabucki and Michael Mumford. Parties have reached a resolution of all matters of dispute. Dismissal entry to be filed within 30 days. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/22/2016. Time: 4 hours 30 mins. (O,K)
November 21, 2016 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Ex-parte telephone conference held on 11/21/2016 with plaintiffs counsel Craig Bashein, Paul Flowers and John Hurst. The court and counsel discussed background information and issues in order to prepare for upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: None) (O,K)
November 18, 2016 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Ex-parte telephone conference held on 11/18/2016 with defendant's counsel Kenneth Prabucki, Paul Karlsgodt and Michael Mumford. The court and counsel discussed background information and issues in order to prepare for upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: None) (O,K)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Setting Mediation/Settlement Conference. Mediation conference to be held before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 11B. Upon receipt of this order, counsel shall contact the magistrate judge's courtroom deputy via email or telephone to schedule the ex-parte telephone conference see order for details. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/7/2016. (O,K)
November 7, 2016 Notice [non-document] of hearing. Ex-parte Telephone Conference set for 11/21/2016 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker with Plaintiff's counsel. Call in instructions have been emailed separately. (Related document #53 ) (O,K)
November 7, 2016 Notice [non-document] of hearing. Ex-parte Telephone Conference set for 11/18/2016 at 02:00 PM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker with Defense counsel. Call in instructions have been emailed separately. (Related document #53 ) (O,K)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/4/16 referring this case to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for mediation to be held 11/22/16. Counsel should contact the chambers of Judge Parker for further instructions. (D,MA)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/4/16 granting the parties' motion for an extension of the previously assigned case deadlines/hearings. No further extensions will be granted. IMPORTANT: The Court amends its case management plan/order as follows: class certification motions to be filed by 1/13/17 with responses due 1/27/17 and replies due 2/3/17. Dispositive motions to be filed 2/6/17 with responses due 3/7/17 and replies due 3/14/17. All discovery to be completed by 5/26/17. Status conference set for 1/19/17 at 12:00 p.m., and final pretrial conference set for 6/5/17 at 12:00 p.m., both in Chambers 18A. Jury trial is reassigned on a two-week standby basis beginning 6/12/17 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Docs. #40 and #50 ) (D,MA)
October 31, 2016 Filing 50 Joint Motion for extension of Current Deadlines until December 31, 2016 filed by Plaintiff Audra Boring. (Bashein, W.)
October 25, 2016 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that the status conference set for 11/17/16 is reset due to a conflict on the Court's calendar. The conference will now be held 12/1/16 at 12:30 p.m., Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. (D,MA)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/11/16 denying the parties' joint motion for a protective order. (Related Doc. #48 ) (D,MA)
October 7, 2016 Filing 48 Joint Motion for protective order filed by Plaintiff Audra Boring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Stipulated Protective Order)(Bashein, W.)
October 5, 2016 Filing 47 FILING ERROR, NOT TEXT SEARCHABLE, EXHIBITS NOT UPLOADED SEPARATELY. Joint Motion for protective order with order attached filed by Plaintiff Audra Boring. (Bashein, W.) Modified text on 10/7/2016 (S,SR).
October 4, 2016 Filing 46 Minutes of telephonic status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 10/4/16. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 41 min.) (D,MA)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/29/16 granting the parties' joint motion to schedule a status conference. IMPORTANT: A telephonic status conference will be held on 10/4/16 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information via email. (Related Doc. #45 ) (D,MA)
September 28, 2016 Filing 45 Joint Request for status conference filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Mumford, Michael) Modified text on 9/29/2016 (S,SR).
September 6, 2016 Filing 44 Notice of Identification of Experts filed by Audra Boring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Nash Group CC, #2 Exhibit 2- Al Yeager CV)(Flowers, Paul) Modified text on 9/7/2016 (S,SR).
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/1/16. Due to the filing of an amended complaint, defendants' motion to dismiss is denied as moot without prejudice as to defendants' right to move to dismiss with regard to the specific allegations contained in the amended complaint. (Related Doc. #29 ) (D,MA)
August 29, 2016 Filing 43 Answer to #42 Amended complaint filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Mumford, Michael)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/22/16. At the case management conference held 8/1/16, the Court gave leave to file an amended complaint. The motion to file an amended complaint is granted as it was filed within the time set out in the Court's case management plan/order. (Related Doc. #37 ) (D,MA)
August 15, 2016 Filing 42 First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Audra Boring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Progressive Declarations and Policy) (Flowers, Paul)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/2/16 that plaintiff shall identify experts by 9/5/16 and defendants shall identify experts by 11/26/16. (D,MA)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Case Management Conference Plan/Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/2/16. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be joined and pleadings amended by 8/15/16. Class certification motions to be filed by 11/14/16 with responses due 11/28/16 and replies due 12/5/16. Dispositive motions to be filed by 12/7/16 with responses due 1/3/17 and replies due 1/10/17. All discovery to be completed by 3/27/17. Status conference set for 11/17/16 at 12:00 p.m., and final pretrial conference set for 4/4/17 at 4:00 p.m., both in Chambers 18A. Jury trial is assigned on a two-week standby basis beginning 4/10/17 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA)
August 2, 2016 Filing 39 Minutes of case management conference held before Judge James S. Gwin on 8/1/16. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 37 min.) (D,MA)
August 1, 2016 Filing 38 Attorney Fees and Costs Estimate filed by Audra Boring. Related document(s) #24 .(Flowers, Paul) Modified text on 8/2/2016 (S,SR).
July 28, 2016 Filing 37 Motion to amend complaint filed by Plaintiff Audra Boring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Flowers, Paul)
July 18, 2016 Filing 36 Reply in support of #29 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Renewal Declarations)(Mumford, Michael)
June 30, 2016 Filing 35 Opposition to #29 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Audra Boring. (Flowers, Paul) Modified text on 7/1/2016 (S,SR).
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/24/16 granting the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until 6/30/16 to file a response to the defendants' pending motion to dismiss. (Related Docs. #29 and #33 ) (D,MA)
June 20, 2016 Filing 34 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bashein, W.) s/ by John Hurst. Modified text on 6/20/2016 (S,SR).
June 17, 2016 Filing 33 Motion for extension of time until June 30, 2016 to file response/reply to #29 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Audra Boring. Related document(s) #29 . (Flowers, Paul)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/13/16 granting the plaintiff's motion to continue the case management conference previously scheduled for 7/28/16 due to a conflict on counsel's calendar. IMPORTANT: The conference will now be held 8/1/16 at 12:00 p.m., Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. (Related Docs. #24 and #32 ) (D,MA)
June 10, 2016 Filing 32 Unopposed Motion to continue 7-28-16 case management conference filed by Plaintiff Audra Boring. (Bashein, W.) Modified text on 6/10/2016 (S,SR).
June 3, 2016 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that the case management conference previously scheduled for 7/7/16 is reset due to a conflict on the Court's calendar. The conference will now be held 7/28/16 at 3:00 p.m., Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. (Related Doc. #24 ) (D,MA)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/25/16 granting the defendants' motion to continue the case management conference set for 6/23/16 due to a scheduling conflict. IMPORTANT: The conference is reset to 7/7/16 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. (Related Docs. #24 and #31 ) (D,MA)
May 24, 2016 Filing 31 Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. Related document(s) #24 . (Mumford, Michael)
May 19, 2016 Filing 30 Answer to Complaint filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Mumford, Michael)
May 19, 2016 Filing 29 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Auto Policy)(Mumford, Michael)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/18/16 granting the motions to appear pro hac vice of Attorneys Paul G. Karlsgodt and Casie D. Collignon on behalf of the defendants. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Docs. #25 , #26 , #27 , and #28 )(D,MA)
May 17, 2016 Filing 28 Supplement Affidavit to #25 Motion for attorney Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #25 . (Prabucki, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/17/2016 (S,SR).
May 16, 2016 Filing 27 Supplement Affidavit to #26 Motion for attorney Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #26 . (Prabucki, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/16/2016 (S,SR).
May 6, 2016 Filing 26 Motion for attorney Casie D. Collignon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7609337, filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
May 6, 2016 Filing 25 Motion for attorney Paul G. Karlsgodt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7609309, filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/25/16 setting a conference for 6/23/16 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA)
April 25, 2016 Filing 23 Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 4/25/16. (D,MA)
April 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/16/16 granting the defendants' motion for an extension of time until 5/19/16 to file an answer to the complaint. The Court requires the filing of an answer. (Related Doc. #22 ) (D,MA)
April 12, 2016 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 19, 2016 to answer filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mumford, Michael) Modified text on 4/13/2016 (S,SR).
April 12, 2016 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for United Financial Casualty Company filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive West Insurance Company filed by Progressive West Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Specialty Insurance Company filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Select Insurance Company filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois filed by Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Preferred Insurance Company filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company filed by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Mountain Insurance Company filed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Max Insurance Company filed by Progressive Max Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp. filed by Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp.. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Gulf Insurance Company filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Express Insurance Company filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Direct Insurance Company filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Bayside Insurance Company filed by Progressive Bayside Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive American Insurance Company filed by Progressive American Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 5 FILING ERROR, DUPLICATE OF #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Mountain Laurel Assurance Company filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. (Mumford, Michael) Modified on 4/13/2016 (S,SR).
April 12, 2016 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Mumford, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
April 12, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Mountain Laurel Assurance Company filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. (Mumford, Michael) Modified text on 4/12/2016 (S,SR).
April 12, 2016 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 16 860266 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-7569026. Filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp., Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois, Progressive Max Insurance Company, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Progressive West Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Bayside Insurance Company, Progressive Mountain Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Service Documents) (Mumford, Michael) Modified text on 4/12/2016 (S,SR).
April 12, 2016 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
April 12, 2016 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (S,SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boring v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Boring
Represented By: John P. Hurst
Represented By: Paul W. Flowers
Represented By: W. Craig Bashein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Bayside Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Premier Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive West Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Max Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Hawaii Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?