U.S. Bank National Association v. Viola et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Jane Doe, Joanne Viola, Cuyahoga Clerk of Courts, State of Ohio, Department of Taxation, Citibank (South Dakota), Chase Bank USA, N.A., Capital One Bank USA, N.A., United States of America, Anthony L. Viola and United States Department of Justice
Cross_defendant: State of Ohio, Department of Taxation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00969
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/27/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants defendant Viola's motion to stay, so long as he posts a supersedeas bond of at least $130,000 within 14 days of th e date of this order. The Court denies Viola's motion to compel. The Court orders Viola to produce documents establishing damages on his default judgment within 21 days of the date of this order. (Related Docs. 87 , 88 , and 89 ) (D,MA)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/13/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, grants both plaintiff's and defendant's motions for default judgment, and denies defendant's motion to vacate. Further, the Court orders plaintiff to submit a proposed order requesting a judgment decree and foreclosure on the property located at 3048 Meadowbrook Boulevard, Cleveland Heights, Ohio for the Court's approval and in full accordance with General Order 2006-16(a)(6). (Related Docs. 64 , 73 , 74 , and 77 ) (D,MA)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/24/17 denying defendant Anthony L. Viola's motion to compel discovery for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 68 ) (D,MA)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/13/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies defendant Viola's motion to dismiss, denies plaintiff's motion for default judgment, and grants plaintiff's motions to dismiss defendant Viola's counterclaims and for relief from the Court's previous order dismissing the following defendants: Citibank (South Dakota), Chase Bank USA, N.A., Capital One Bank, N.A., Joanne Viola, State Department of Taxation, and Cuyahoga County Clerk of Courts. (Related Docs. 32 , 52 , 58 , and 61 ) (D,MA)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/27/17 denying defendant Anthony L. Viola's motion to hold all proceedings in abeyance pending Court of Appeals review for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 46 ) (D,MA)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/23/17 denying as moot defendant Anthony L. Viola's motion for default judgment. (Related Doc. 8 ) (D,MA)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/9/17 denying defendant Anthony L. Viola's motion for reconsideration for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 21 ) (D,MA)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/20/16 denying plaintiff's motion to remand for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 19 ) (D,MA)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/1/16. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants the government's motion to dismiss defendant Anthony L. Viola's counterclaim and denies defendant Viola's motions to refer prosecutorial misconduct and leave to amend. (Related Docs. [1-2], 6 , 12 , and 13 ) (D,MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Viola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: David B. Bokor
Represented By: John E. Codrea
Represented By: Matthew P. Curry
Represented By: Justin M. Ritch
Represented By: Timothy C. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga Clerk of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio, Department of Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony L. Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: State of Ohio, Department of Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?