Meredith v. United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Meredith
Defendant: United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01102
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. 62 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Expert discovery and class certification briefing deadlines will be reset at the telephonic status conference on June 11, 2018. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/31/18. (LC,S)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Defendant United Collection Bureau, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 49 ) is DENIED. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/18. (LC,S)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Class Data (Doc. 28 , 35 ) is GRANTED and Defendant United Collection Bureau, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order (Doc. 30 ) is DENIED. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/13/17. (LC,S)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. 19 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant is ordered to supplement its discovery responses consistent with the foregoing within fourteen days of the date this Order, unless otherwise indicated. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/10/16. (LC,S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith v. United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Meredith
Represented By: Alexander H. Burke
Represented By: Mitchel E. Luxenburg
Represented By: David M. Marco
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?