Chapman et al v. Tristar Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Chapman, Jessica Vennel and Jason Jackson
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01114
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Medina
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/3/19 denying plaintiffs' motion to require the Arizona Attorney General and the State of Arizona to post an appeal bond. (Related Doc. 171 ) (D,MA)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/4/18. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies movants' Arizona Attorney General's Office, State of Arizona motion to intervene and denies movants' request to be deemed formal objectors. (Related Doc. 154 ) (D,MA)
July 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/9/17 denying plaintiffs' motion to exclude Eric Theiss from testifying at trial. (Related Doc. 117 ) (D,MA)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/6/17 granting plaintiffs' motion to compel Matthew Fisher's videoconference testimony. (Related Doc. 99 ) (D,MA)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/3/17 granting defendant's motion to strike plaintiff Chapman, Vennel, and Jackson's personal injury claims from this law suit without prejudice for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 97 ) (D,MA)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/28/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants plaintiffs' motion to strike witnesses Kishore Mirchandani and Vanessa Haltrecht. (Related Docs. 82 and 85 ) (D,MA)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/20/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies defendant's motion to decertify the Class and bifurcates the 7/10/17 trial. (Related Docs. 78 , 79 , 83 , and 84 ) (D,MA)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/28/17 denying defendant's motion to exclude Dr. John Pratt's expert testimony for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Docs. 49 , 56 , 61 , and 62 ) (D,MA)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/24/17 granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion for class certification and certifying the classes as set forth in this order. IMPORTANT: Final pretrial conference reset to 7/3/17 at 12:00 p.m., Chambers 18A and jury trial is reassigned for 7/10/17 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Docs. 43 , 45 , and 47 ) (D,MA)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/24/17. The Court denies plaintiffs' objection to defendant's expert Jason M. Mattice's report and cancels the 3/29/17 hearing for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Docs. 54 and 55 ) (D,MA)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/18/17 denying defendant's motion to seal for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 41 ) (D,MA)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/26/16 denying the parties' proposed protective order. (Related Doc. 25 ) (D,MA)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/25/16. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants in part and denies in part defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' class action complaint. (Related Docs. 18 , 23 , and 29 ) (D,MA) Modified text 10/25/2016 (C,KA).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman et al v. Tristar Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Chapman
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Tyler J. Story
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Vennel
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Tyler J. Story
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Jackson
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Tyler J. Story
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence A. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?