Dovala v. Tim
Petitioner: Melissa Dovala
Respondent: Ginine Tim
Case Number: 1:2016cv02511
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lorain
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Presiding Judge: James R. Knepp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order: Respondent's Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal (Doc. No. 39 ) is GRANTED as set forth herein. The Court takes Petitioner's Motion for Bond (Doc. No. 41 ) under advisement and refers this matter to Pretrial Services for an investigation and recommendation in relation to the appropriate conditions, if any, for Petitioner's release. An evidentiary hearing will be scheduled once the Court receives a report from Pretrial Services. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/30/2020. (S,SR)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set for in this order, the Court respectfully declines to adopt the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. (Doc. 26 .) The Court hereby conditionally grants a writ of habeas corpus to Dovala. Unless a date for a new trial is scheduled within 120 days, Dovala must be unconditionally released. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/19/2020. (L,Ja)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum of Opinion and Order of Transfer. For the reasons stated in the Order, the Court overrules the Objections (Doc #: 16 ), adopts the Report and Recommendation (Doc #: 13 ), and grants the Motion to Transfer habeas petition to the Sixth Circuit as a second or successive petition (Doc #: 7 .) Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/22/2017. (K,K)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FILING ERROR. Memorandum Opinion and Order recommending that the Court grant Respondent's motion to transfer 7 and transfer matter to the Sixth Circuit for Petitioner to request permission to proceed with a second or successive petition. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 7/21/17. (A,P) Modified on 7/21/2017 (Filer refiling)(D,TM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dovala v. Tim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa Dovala
Represented By: Sarah M. Schregardus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ginine Tim
Represented By: Jerri L. Fosnaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?