Mason v. Polster et al
Plaintiff: Mason and Valerie Mason
Defendant: Polster, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, TAP Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. and Honorable Dan A. Polster
Case Number: 1:2016cv02924
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 Appeal Order from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied re #16 (No. 18-5591) (H,SP)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 Appeal Remark from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 8/9/18 and placed on the docket 8/15/18 as No. 18-5591 (H,SP)
June 12, 2018 Filing 15 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3117). Date issued as mandate 6/11/18, Costs: None (H,SP)
October 5, 2017 Filing 13 Appeal Remark (Notice) as to appeal fee payment filed by plaintiff re #10 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Sixth Circuit Order)(H,SP)
October 5, 2017 USCA Appeal Fees $505 received, receipt number 14660098797 re #10 Notice of Appeal (H,SP)
August 15, 2017 Filing 12 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the in forma pauperis motion re #10 Notice of Appeal. Unless appellant pays the $505 filing fee to the district court within thirty days of the entry of this order, this appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution (USCA# 17-3117). Date issued by USCA 8/15/17 (H,SP)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration (Related Doc #9 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/8/2017.(H,CM)
February 8, 2017 Copy of (non-document) Order on Motion for reconsideration mailed to Valerie Mason at 14050 Cedar Road, Apt. 209, University Heights, OH 44118 on 2/8/2017. (H,CM)
February 7, 2017 Filing 11 Appeal Remark from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: The appeal re #10 will be held in abeyance until after the District Court rules on the pending Motion for reconsideration (USCA# 17-3117) (H,SP)
February 7, 2017 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3117). Date filed in USCA 2/6/17. (H,SP)
February 2, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #7 Opinion and Order and #8 Judgment Entry of 1/24/17, filed by Valerie Mason. Filing fee paid 10/5/17, receipt# 14660098797 (H,SP). Modified on 10/5/2017 for fee payment (H,SP).
February 2, 2017 Filing 9 Motion for reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Valerie Mason.(Related document(s) #8 , #7 ) (H,SP)
January 24, 2017 Filing 8 Judgment Entry. In accordance with the Court's Opinion and Order, this action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/24/2017. (H,CM)
January 24, 2017 Filing 7 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related doc #2 ) is granted. Action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/24/2017. (H,CM)
January 24, 2017 Copy of #8 Judgment, #7 Memorandum Opinion and Order, mailed to Valerie Mason at 14050 Cedar Road, Apt. 209, University Heights, OH 44118 on 1/24/2017. Related document(s) #8 , #7 . (H,CM)
January 19, 2017 Filing 6 Request (Motion) for affirmative relief filed by Plaintiff Valerie Mason. (W,CM)
January 11, 2017 Filing 5 Response from Attorney General filed by Valerie Mason. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from Ohio Attorney General)(W,CM)
January 5, 2017 Filing 4 Affidavit filed by Valerie Mason. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Documents)(W,CM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2017: #2 Redacted Miscellaneous Documents) (W,CM). Modified on 1/9/2017 (W,CM).
December 15, 2016 Filing 3 Notification of Documents Sent to Department of Justice filed by Valerie Mason. (Attachments: #1 Fax Transmission Report)Related document(s) #1 .(W,CM)
December 5, 2016 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Valerie Mason. (W,Jo)
December 5, 2016 Filing 1 Complaint against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, Dan A. Polster, TAP Pharmaceutical Products, Inc.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Valerie Mason. (Attachments: #1 Various Court/Doctor Documents, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Attorney General/Tap Pharmaceutical Products Inc/Honorable Dan A. Polster/Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc./U.S. Attorney/, #5 U.S. Marshal Forms - Attorney General/Tap Pharmaceutical Products Inc/Honorable Dan A. Polster/Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc./U.S. Attorney) (W,Jo)
December 5, 2016 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (W,Jo)
December 5, 2016 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (S,SR)
December 5, 2016 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. Recused as Judge Polster is listed as a party to case. (S,SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Polster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAP Pharmaceutical Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Dan A. Polster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?