Wheatt et al v. City of East Cleveland et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Wheatt and Laurese Glover
Defendant: City of East Cleveland, Michael C. Perry, Vincent K. Johnstone, D. J. Miklovich, Patricia Lane, Charles Teel, John C. Bradford, Terrence Dunn, Carmen Marino, Deborah Naiman and Cuyahoga County
Case Number: 1:2017cv00377
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/24/2020. The Court denies Plaintiffs renewed motion for judgment on their indemnification claim against the City of East Cleveland as moot.(Related Doc # 414 )(S,KM)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/11/2020. The Court disqualifies East Cleveland Law Director from continued representation of defendants Johnstone and Perry. The Court orders defendants Johnstone and Perry to obtain new representation within 30 days of this order. New counsel must file a response to Plaintiff's motion for judgment within 21 days of appearing. (S,KM)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/27/2020. The Court denies Defendants' motion to set aside judgment and Plaintiffs' request for sanctions, for the reasons as set forth in this order. 409 410 (S,KM)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/19/2019. The Court denies Defendants' motion for reconsideration for the reasons as set forth in this order. Related Doc # 405 (S,KM)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/22/2019. The Court grants the plaintiff's motion to substitute Karen Perry, as Executor of Michael Perry's Estate, as the Defendant in place of Michael Perry, for the reasons as set forth in this order. (Related Doc # 396 )(S,KM)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/29/19. Because there is no final judgment, the Court denies defendants' motions to stay execution of judgment, stay debt collection proceedings, and to waive bond as premature. Defendants may renew these motions once the Court renders final judgment in this case. (Related Docs. 364 , 385 , and 387 ) (D,MA)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/20/18. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants plaintiffs' motion to set a trial date. Trial is set for 11/13/18 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Doc. 219 ) (D,MA)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/6/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants plaintiffs' motions to certify defendants' appeals as frivolous. The Court declines to stay the trial of this matter pending appeal. (Related Docs. 132 and 164 ) (D,MA)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/27/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this entry, grants plaintiffs' requested Rule 37 sanctions. The Court quashes defendant City of East Cleveland's 11/22/17 subpoenas. The Court orders defendant City of East Cleveland to pay plaintiffs' costs and reasonable attorneys' fees stemming from litigating plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. (Related Doc. 133 ) (D,MA)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/15/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies without prejudice plaintiffs' motion for further sanctions, denies the City defendants' motion to strike Tamika Ha rris' affidavit, and denies the County defendants' motion to compel. The Court further orders the City defendants to produce a competent and prepared Rule 30(b)(6) witness within seven days of the date of this order. City defendants shall pay the court reporter and transcript costs of this deposition, as well as plaintiffs' reasonable attorneys' fees. (Related Docs. 103 , 110 , 116 , and 119 ) (D,MA)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/14/17 granting in part and denying in part the City Defendants' motion for leave to amend their answer. (Related Doc. 123 ) (D,MA)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/9/17. For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court denies plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, denies the County defendants' motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs 9; access to courts claim, and grants in part and denies in part the City defendants' motion for summary judgment. The Court further grants plaintiffs' motion to strike the City defendants' "pro se" brief, and grants defendants' motions for summary judgment on plaintiffs' conceded claims. (Related Docs. 77 , 78 , 84 , 86 , 87 , 97 , 105 ) (D,MA)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/22/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies the City of East Cleveland and the City defendants' motion for reconsideration of the Court's prior order granting plaintiffs' request for the release of grand jury transcripts and minutes. (Related Doc. 52 ) (D,MA)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/8/17. The Court grants plaintiffs' motion and directs the Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas and the Chief Court Reporter for Cuyahoga County to release the transcripts and minutes from the grand jury proceedings relating to the murder of Clifton Hudson as set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 39 ) (D,MA)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/26/17 denying the East Cleveland defendants' motion to dismiss for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Docs. 15 and 34 ) (D,MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheatt et al v. City of East Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of East Cleveland
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Perry
Represented By: Mark V. Guidetti
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanculak
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent K. Johnstone
Represented By: Mark V. Guidetti
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanculak
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. J. Miklovich
Represented By: Mark V. Guidetti
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanculak
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lane
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Teel
Represented By: Mark V. Guidetti
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanculak
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Bradford
Represented By: Mark V. Guidetti
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanculak
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Dunn
Represented By: Mark V. Guidetti
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanculak
Represented By: Willa Hemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Marino
Represented By: Charles E. Hannan
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Naiman
Represented By: Charles E. Hannan
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County
Represented By: Charles E. Hannan
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Wheatt
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurese Glover
Represented By: Michael I. Kanovitz
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?