International Watchman Inc. v. 81 January Inc.
Plaintiff: International Watchman Inc.
Defendant: 81 January Inc., William L. Shaine and John Does
Case Number: 1:2017cv00497
Filed: March 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Medina
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/31/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants defendants' motion to dismiss. (Related Docs. 24 and 29 ) (D,MA)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/6/2017. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion for reconsideration, GRANTS Defendants' motion for an extension, and ORDERS Plaintiff to serve Defendants in accordance with the Local Rules. (Related document 18 ) (O,K)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/18/17 granting plaintiff's motion to strike defendant's Director Shaine's motions to dismiss and for leave to appear. (Related Docs. 6 , 12 , and 15 ) (D,MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Watchman Inc. v. 81 January Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Watchman Inc.
Represented By: C. Vincent Choken
Represented By: John D. Gugliotta
Represented By: David A. Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 81 January Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Shaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?