City of Lorain v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: City of Lorain
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Perry Fine, Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster, Actavis PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01639
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lorain
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal as to Russell Portenoy without prejudice. (Related document #70 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/21/2018. (K,K)
March 20, 2018 Filing 70 Amended Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice filed by Russell Portenoy. (Spencer, S.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal as to Russell Portenoy. Related document #68 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/20/2018. (K,K)
March 19, 2018 Filing 68 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (s/ Paul J. Napoli, Spencer, S.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 67 Transfer Order from Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) transferring case to MDL 2804. (1:17-op-45000, Judge Dan A. Polster) (C,KA)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order For the reasons stated in the Order, the Court will hold its ruling on the remand motion in abeyance pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision. (Related document #34 , #32 ) Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/27/2017. (K,K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2017: #1 Corrected Order ) (K,K). Notice regenerated on 10/27/2017 (K,K).
October 26, 2017 Filing 65 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by City of Lorain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Staubus v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., 2:17-cv-122 (E.D. Tenn. Oct. 20, 2017))Related document(s) #32 .(Badala, Salvatore)
October 20, 2017 Filing 64 Reply in support of #27 Motion to remand to State Court filed by City of Lorain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice Regarding Potential Non-Party Fault)(Climaco, John)
October 17, 2017 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergan PLC. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 17, 2017 Filing 62 Consent to Removal filed by Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 11, 2017 Filing 61 Notice of Recent Development Relevant to Plaintiff's Pending Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined MDL Motion In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation)Related document(s) #32 .(Rendon, Carole)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order granting Defendant Allergan Finance, LLC's Unopposed Motion to stay date by which to respond to Plaintiff's complaint (Related Doc #59 ). Allergan Finance, LLC's answer is due within 60 days of final determination of removal. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/11/2017.(K,K)
October 11, 2017 Filing 59 Unopposed Motion to stay Date by which to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenwell, Stacey)
October 10, 2017 Filing 58 Attorney Appearance by Andrea B. Daloia filed by on behalf of Actavis, Inc.. (Daloia, Andrea)
October 6, 2017 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
October 6, 2017 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK Unlimited, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon, Inc. filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Blake, Jason)
October 6, 2017 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Blake, Jason)
October 6, 2017 Filing 54 Notice of Joinder in the Endo Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Blake, Jason)
October 6, 2017 Filing 53 Joint Response of Distributor Defendants to #32 Amended Motion to remand to State Court filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Murray, Joseph) Modified text on 10/13/2017 (G,TH).
October 6, 2017 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Buckley, Daniel)
October 6, 2017 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Buckley, Daniel)
October 6, 2017 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma Inc.. (Buckley, Daniel)
October 6, 2017 Filing 49 Notice of Joinder in the Endo Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. Related document(s) #34 .(Buckley, Daniel)
October 5, 2017 Filing 48 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Related document(s) #34 .(Lewis, John)
October 2, 2017 Filing 47 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc.'s and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed by Russell Portenoy. Related document(s) #34 .(Rauch, Jordan)
September 29, 2017 Filing 46 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand (ECF #34) filed by Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. Related document(s) #34 .(Tarney, Tyler)
September 29, 2017 Filing 45 Attorney Appearance by Albert J. Lucas and Jason J. Blake filed by on behalf of Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Lucas, Albert) Modified text on 10/2/2017 (M, S).
September 26, 2017 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Stacey A. Greenwell and John R. Mitchell filed by on behalf of Actavis, Inc. (Greenwell, Stacey)
September 26, 2017 Filing 43 Notice of Joinder in Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed by Actavis, Inc.. Related document(s) #34 .(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC for Actavis, Inc. filed by Actavis, Inc.. (Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Timothy W. Knapp, Martin L. Roth, Jennifer G. Levy, and Donna M. Welch for Actavis, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #38 , #39 , #40 , #41 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/22/2017.(K,K)
September 22, 2017 Filing 41 Motion for attorney Donna M. Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8337868, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 40 Motion for attorney Jennifer G. Levy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8337859, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 39 Motion for attorney Martin L. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8337855, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 38 Motion for attorney Timothy W. Knapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8337702, filed by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenwell, Stacey)
September 21, 2017 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Mark W. Bernlohr filed by on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Bernlohr, Mark)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #32 Amended Motion to remand to State Court . Replies due by 10/20/2017. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/20/2017.(K,K)
September 20, 2017 Filing 36 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 20, 2017 to file response/reply to #32 Amended Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. Related document(s) #32 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Climaco, John)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order The Court hereby DIRECTS the Manufacturer Defendants other than Endo to either file a response to the pending Amended Motion to Remand or file a notice joining Endo's response to the Amended Motion no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, October 6, 2017. The Court also DIRECTS the Distributor Defendants and the Physician Defendants to file a response to the Amended Motion to Remand no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, October 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/18/2017. (K,K)
September 14, 2017 Filing 34 Opposition to #27 Motion to remand to State Court , #32 Amended Motion to remand to State Court As to the Manufacturer and Physician Defendants filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
September 12, 2017 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance by Tyler G. Tarney filed by on behalf of Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. (Tarney, Tyler)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot #27 Motion to Remand to State Court based on the filing of a properly filed motion (Doc #: #32 ). Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/8/2017.(K,K)
September 7, 2017 Filing 32 Amended Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Climaco, John)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Marginal Entry Order granting in part Defendant Portenoy's #29 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer complaint pending final determination of removal. The answer is due 60 days following the final determination of removal. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/7/2017.(K,K)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order granting Unopposed Motion that AmerisourceBergren Corporation not be required to respond or answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Related Doc #28 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/7/2017.(K,K)
September 6, 2017 Filing 29 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer complaint pending final determination of removal filed by Defendant Russell Portenoy. (Scheaf, O.)
September 1, 2017 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion That AmerisourceBergren Corporation not be Required to Respond or Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zerrusen, Sandra) Modified text 9/7/2017 (K,K).
August 31, 2017 Filing 27 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Climaco, John)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney David M. Cuppage removed from case. (Related Doc #26 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/25/2017.(K,K)
August 24, 2017 Filing 26 Motion by David M. Cuppage to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Cuppage, David)
August 24, 2017 Filing 25 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court documents returned to Lorain County Clerk of Court. (P,WL)
August 24, 2017 Filing 24 Attorney Appearance of O. Judson Scheaf, III and Jordan D. Rauch by Jordan D. Rauch filed by on behalf of Russell Portenoy. (Rauch, Jordan)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal filed by Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman (Related Doc #23 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/23/2017.(K,K)
August 23, 2017 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal filed by Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. Related document(s) #1 . (Hyzak, Daniel)
August 23, 2017 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lewis, John)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Steven A. Reed and Tinos Diamantatos for Cephalon, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #20 , #21 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/22/2017.(K,K)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney J. Gordon Cooney removed from case. (Related Doc #19 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/22/2017.(K,K)
August 22, 2017 Filing 21 Motion for attorney Tinos Diamantatos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8294559, filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Yanchar, Georgia)
August 22, 2017 Filing 20 Motion for attorney Steven A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8294525, filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Yanchar, Georgia)
August 22, 2017 Filing 19 Motion by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to withdraw as attorney filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Yanchar, Georgia)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Charles C. Lifland as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #18 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/22/2017.(K,K)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney Margaret M. Metzinger removed from case. (Related Doc #17 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/22/2017.(K,K)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. and Sean O. Morris as to Defendant Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and End Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #15 , #16 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/22/2017.(K,K) Modified text, notice regenerated 8/22/2017 (K,K).
August 22, 2017 Filing 18 Motion for attorney Charles C. Lifland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8294153, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Charles Lifland, #4 Exhibit C, Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
August 22, 2017 Filing 17 Motion by Margaret M. Metzinger to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Metzinger, Margaret)
August 21, 2017 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Sean O. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8292558, filed by Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rendon, Carole)
August 21, 2017 Filing 15 Motion for attorney Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8292338, filed by Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rendon, Carole)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Patrick J. Fitzgerald. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #14 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/18/2017.(K,K) Modified on 8/22/2017 to add attorney's name(G,CA).
August 18, 2017 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Patrick J. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8290306, filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Daniel)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by R. Ryan Stoll Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #13 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/18/2017.(K,K) Modified on 8/22/2017 to add attorney's name. (G,CA).
August 18, 2017 Filing 13 Motion for attorney R. Ryan Stoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8290228, filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Daniel)
August 16, 2017 Filing 12 Original case file 17CV192705 received from Lorain County Clerk of Court. Record returned to Lorain County Clerk of Court. (P,WL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2017: #1 Acknowledgment Letter to Lorain County Clerk) (P,WL).
August 16, 2017 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Bruce A. Moore filed by on behalf of Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. (Moore, Bruce)
August 16, 2017 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Hyzak filed by on behalf of Lynn Webster, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman. (Hyzak, Daniel)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Unopposed Motion that McKesson Corporation not be required to respond to complaint (Related Doc #9 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/16/2017.(K,K)
August 15, 2017 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion that McKesson Corporation not be required to respond to complaint filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Endo Health Solutions Inc., Unopposed Motion to stay the Date By Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal filed by Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Related Doc #8 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/14/2017.(K,K) Modified text on 8/15/2017 (B,R).
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion that Cardinal Health, Inc. Not be Required to Respond to Complaint (Related Doc #7 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/14/2017.(K,K)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Hunter J. Shkolnik, Joseph L. Ciaccio, and Salvatore C. Badala for City of Lorain. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #4 , #5 , #6 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/14/2017.(K,K)
August 11, 2017 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date By Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal filed by Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Tera - s/ by Carole S. Rendon) Modified text on 8/14/2017 (G,TH).
August 11, 2017 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion that Cardinal Health, Inc. Not be Required to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Murray, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8280957, filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8280951, filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
August 11, 2017 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Hunter J. Shkolnik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8280922, filed by Plaintiff City of Lorain. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Salvatore C. Badala. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Paul J. Napoli. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney James W. Matthews. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Sean O. Morris. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Charles C. Lifland. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Tinos Diamantatos. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Steven A. Reed. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney J. Gordon Cooney. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney R. Ryan Stoll. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 9, 2017 Notice to Attorney Patrick J. Fitzgerald. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
August 4, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Related document(s) #1 .(Coleman, Tera) Modified text and added affiliate on 8/9/2017 (B,R).
August 4, 2017 Notice by Clerk that Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (P,WL)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (P,WL)
August 4, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (P,WL)
August 4, 2017 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (P,WL)
August 4, 2017 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 17 CV 192705 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8271689.. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 Miscellaneous Case Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 Case Law, #5 Exhibit 4 Case Law) (Coleman, Tera) Modified text on 8/4/2017 (P,WL).
August 4, 2017 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas, case number 17 CV 192705 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8271689.. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, # 3 Exhibit 2 Miscellaneous Case Documents, # 4 Exhibit 3 Case Law, # 5 Exhibit 4 Case Law) (Coleman, Tera) Modified text on 8/4/2017 (P,WL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Lorain v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Sean Morris,
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Represented By: Andrew N. Schock
Represented By: Aaron E. McQueen
Represented By: Mark W. Bernlohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Represented By: Jason J. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lorain
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Margaret M. Metzinger
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: David M. Cuppage
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick G. Warner
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: D. Scott Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?