In re TransDigm Group, Inc. Securities Litigation, Master File No. 1:17 CV 1677
Plaintiff: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Terrance M Paradie, W. Nicholas Howley and TransDigm Group Incorporated
Petitioner: District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust
Case Number: 1:2017cv01958
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 36 Judgment Entry For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion filed contemporaneously herewith, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 70 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request to seek leave to amend its Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. The case is hereby TERMINATED. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-PAB, 1:17-cv-01958-PAB(L,Ja)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Memorandum Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth in this order, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 70 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request to seek leave to amend its Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/19/2020. Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-PAB, 1:17-cv-01958-PAB(L,Ja)
July 5, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela A. Barker pursuant to General Order 2019-13. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN (B,R)
July 5, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge Donald C. Nugent terminated. (B,R)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge Baughman and thereby adopts the proposed schedule for future action in this matter as agreed to by the parties. The outstanding motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/27/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN (R,JM)
November 27, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice (non-document) of Status Conference scheduled 3/27/2019 at 9:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN (R,JM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 33 Joint Stipulation & Order regarding deadlines and dates agreed to. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/19/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN(R,JM)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for a report and recommendation on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF #48) currently pending in this action. A report and recommendation shall be completed by December 3, 2018. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/29/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN(R,JM)
August 29, 2018 Filing 31 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 8/29/18. Oral arguments presented and Court to rule. Time: 90 min. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN(R,JM)
August 17, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice (non-document) of Status Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN (R,JM)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting TransDigm Defendants' (52) Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of 48 Motion to Dismiss until 8/10/18 ; in case 1:17-cv-01677-DCN. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/13/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN (M,S)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion For Leave to File a Brief in Excess page limitations (Related Doc # 50 ) in case 1:17-cv-01677-DCN. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/25/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN (R,JM)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for Leave to exceed page limitations (Related Doc # 47 ) in case 1:17-cv-01677-DCN. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/08/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01677-DCN, 1:17-cv-01958-DCN(R,JM)
December 5, 2017 Filing 30 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting the motion of Hollywood Firefighters to Consolidate and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Motion for Approval of its Selection of Lead Counsel (ECF #17 in Case No. 1:17CV 1677 and ECF #15 in Case No. 1:17 CV 1958). The above-captioned related actions are hereby consolidated as In re TransDigm Group, Inc. Securities Litigation, Master File No. 1:17 CV 1677. The file in Case No. 1:17 CV 1677 shall constitute the master file for every action in the consolidated action. When the document being filed pertains to all actions, the phrase All Actions shall appear immediately after the phrase This Document Relates To:. When a pleading applies to some, but not all, of the actions, the document shall list, immediately after the phrase This Document Relates To:, the docket number for each individual action to which the document applies, along with the last name of the first-listed plaintiff in said action. Hollywood Firefighters is appointed to serve as Lead Plaintiff pursuant to Section21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B), as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, in the consolidated action. Hollywood Firefighters selection of Lead Counsel is approved, and Saxena White P.A. is appointed as Lead Counsel for the Class, and Climaco Wilcox Peca & Garofoli Co., LPA is appointed as Local Counsel for the Class. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/4/2017. (C,KA) Modified text 12/6/2017 (C,KA).
November 15, 2017 Filing 29 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 11/15/17. Court to determine whether to consolidate cases. Competing motions for appointment of lead counsel which are briefed. Oral arguments presented. Court to rule on all pending motions. Time: 30. (R,JM)
November 8, 2017 Filing 28 Address Change Notice by Scott D. Simpkins filed by on behalf of City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Simpkins, Scott)
October 31, 2017 Filing 27 Reply in support of #16 Motion to consolidate cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Motion for Approval of Selection as Lead Counsel filed by District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Halpert Enterprises v. Goodyear Complaint))(Landskroner, Jack)
October 31, 2017 Filing 26 Reply in support of #15 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Counsel and Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Simpkins, Scott)
October 24, 2017 Filing 25 Declaration of Jack Landskroner in Support of Opposition filed by District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust. Related document(s) #24 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bloomberg sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - City of Hollywood adjusted short class period loss, #3 Exhibit 3 - City of Hollywood unadjusted short class period loss, #4 Exhibit 4 - City of Hollywood adjusted long class period loss, #5 Exhibit 5 - City of Hollywood unadjusted long class period loss, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pension Fund adjusted short class period loss, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pension Fund unadjusted short class period loss, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pension Fund adjusted long class period loss, #9 Exhibit 9 - Pension Fund unadjusted long class period loss, #10 Exhibit 10 - LIFO/FIFO comparison, #11 Exhibit 11 - Dana Final Approval Hearing Transcript)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified text on 10/25/2017 (M, S).
October 24, 2017 Filing 24 Opposition to #15 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Counsel, and Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust. (Landskroner, Jack) Modified text on 10/25/2017 (M, S).
October 24, 2017 Filing 23 Opposition to #16 Motion to consolidate cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Motion for Approval of Selection as Lead Counsel filed by City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph E. White, #2 Exhibit A - Updated Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit C - Opinion and Order, #5 Exhibit D - Memorandum of Law)(Simpkins, Scott) Modified text on 10/25/2017 (M, S).
October 19, 2017 Filing 22 Notice of Clarification on Certification and Loss Chart filed by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A Securities Transactions, #2 Exhibit Clarified Loss Chart)Related document(s) #17 .(Landskroner, Jack) Modified text on 10/20/2017 (M, S).
October 16, 2017 Filing 21 Proposed Order Consolidating the Related Actions filed by City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Simpkins, Scott)
October 12, 2017 Filing 20 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Case Management Conference held on 10/12/17. Case is assigned to the standard track. Next Status Conference set for 11/15/2017 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Time: 25. (R,JM)
October 11, 2017 Filing 19 Motion for attorney Tricia L. McCormick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8361936, filed by Plaintiff City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified duplicate text on 10/11/2017 (G,CA).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiffs Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Tricia L. McCormick for City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #19 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/11/17.(R,JM)
October 10, 2017 Filing 18 Proposed Order filed by District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust. Related document(s) #16 . (Landskroner, Jack)
October 10, 2017 Filing 17 Declaration of Jack Landskroner filed by District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust. Related document(s) #16 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume, #5 Exhibit E - Landskroner Grieco Merriman LLC firm resume)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified text on 10/11/2017 (M, S).
October 10, 2017 Filing 16 Motion to consolidate cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Motion for Approval of Selection as Lead Counsel filed by Movant District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified text/event type on 10/11/2017 (M, S).
October 10, 2017 Filing 15 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of its Selection of Counsel, and Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit of Joseph E. White, III, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency, #4 Exhibit B - Certification, #5 Exhibit C - Chart of Transactions, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Biography, #7 Exhibit E - Firm Biography, #8 Proposed Order)(Simpkins, Scott) Modified text/added motion event on 10/11/2017 (M, S).
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order scheduling a case management conference to be held on 10/12/2017 at 11:30 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/10/17. (R,JM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment as related to 1:17CV1677 to Judge Donald C. Nugent for all further proceedings. Judges Christopher A. Boyko and Donald C. Nugent on 10/10/2017. (H,CM)
October 10, 2017 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. Judge Christopher A. Boyko terminated. (P,WL)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for attorney Henry Rosen to appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #10 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/6/2017.(H,CM)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #11 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/10/2017 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/6/2017.(H,CM)
October 4, 2017 Filing 12 Notice of Related Action 1:17-cv-01677-DCN filed by plaintiffs. (Landskroner, Jack) Modified on 10/5/2017 (S,HR).
October 4, 2017 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for 60-day extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint filed by W. Nicholas Howley, Terrance M Paradie, TransDigm Group Incorporated. (Slater, James) Modified on 10/5/2017 (S,HR).
October 4, 2017 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Henry Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8353675, filed by Plaintiff City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Henry Rosen)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified to correct attorney name on 10/4/2017 (M,TL).
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs' Motions for attorneys Brian E. Cochran, David C. Walton and Thomas C. Michaud to appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #'s #7 , #8 , #9 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/27/2017.(H,CM)
September 26, 2017 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Thomas C. Michaud to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8341510, filed by Plaintiff City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified duplicate text on 9/27/2017 (G,CA).
September 26, 2017 Filing 8 Motion for attorney David C. Walton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8341505, filed by Plaintiff City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified duplicate text on 9/27/2017 (G,CA).
September 26, 2017 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8341482, filed by Plaintiff City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Landskroner, Jack) Modified duplicate text on 9/27/2017 (G,CA).
September 22, 2017 Notice to Attorney Brian E. Cochran. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 22, 2017 Notice to Attorney David C. Walton. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 22, 2017 Notice to Attorney Thomas C. Michaud. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
September 20, 2017 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Terrance M Paradie on 9/19/2017, filed on behalf of City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System Related document(s) #1 . (Landskroner, Jack)
September 20, 2017 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon W. Nicholas Howley on 9/19/2017, filed on behalf of City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System Related document(s) #1 . (Landskroner, Jack)
September 20, 2017 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon TransDigm Group Incorporated c/o The Corporation trust Company on 9/19/17 filed on behalf of City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Landskroner, Jack) Modified text on 9/21/2017 (S,HR).
September 20, 2017 Filing 3 Return of Service by personal service executed upon TransDigm Group Incorporated on 9/19/2017, filed on behalf of City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System Related document(s) #1 . (Landskroner, Jack)
September 18, 2017 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon W. Nicholas Howley, Terrance M Paradie, TransDigm Group Incorporated (at 2 addresses). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (W,Jo) Modified on 9/19/2017 (S,HR).
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8329786.. Filed by City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons to Transdigm Group Incorporated, #3 Summons to Transdigm Group Incorporated c/o Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Company, #4 Summons to W. Nicholas Howley, #5 Summons to Terrance Paradie) (Landskroner, Jack)
September 18, 2017 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (W,Jo)
September 18, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (W,Jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re TransDigm Group, Inc. Securities Litigation, Master File No. 1:17 CV 1677
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance M Paradie
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Nicholas Howley
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransDigm Group Incorporated
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: David C. Walton
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Represented By: Thomas C. Michaud
Represented By: Henry Rosen
Represented By: Tricia L. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District No. 9, I.A. of M. & A.W. Pension Trust
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?