Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis PLC and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv02171
Filed: October 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney John W. Barrett removed from case. (Related Doc #18 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/27/2018.(K,K)
March 5, 2018 Filing 18 Motion by John W. "Don" Barrett to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John)
December 11, 2017 Filing 17 Transfer Order from Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) transferring case to MDL 2804. (1:17-op-45002, Judge Dan A. Polster) (C,KA)
November 17, 2017 Filing 16 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #13 , #2 , #1 . (Kennedy, R.) Modified on 12/7/2017. Return of Service unexecuted upon Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. No signature on green card. (G,CA).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Related Doc #15 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/13/2017.(W,CM)
November 10, 2017 Filing 15 Joint Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
November 9, 2017 Filing 14 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon AmerisourceBergen Corporation on 10/20/2017, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Kennedy, R.)
November 9, 2017 Filing 13 FILING ERROR. Incomplete document. Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Actavis Pharma, Inc. on 10/20/2017; Cardinal Health, Inc. on 10/20/2017; Cephalon, Inc. on 10/20/2017; Endo Health Solutions, Inc. on 10/24/2017; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/23/2017; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. on 11/1/2017; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/23/2017; McKesson Corporation on 10/23/2017; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/26/2017; Purdue Frederick Company Inc. on 10/23/2017; Purdue Pharma Inc. on 10/23/2017; Purdue Pharma L.P. on 10/23/2017; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd. on 10/20/2017; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 10/20/2017, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Kennedy, R.) Modified text on 11/16/2017 (G,CA).
November 9, 2017 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 9, 2017 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Alana V. Tanoury filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Tanoury, Alana)
November 9, 2017 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Vincent I. Holzhall filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #8 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' are directed to file responsive pleadings no later than 30 days after a final termination of transfer is reached. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/8/2017. (K,K)
November 7, 2017 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corporation filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra)
November 7, 2017 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion to stay the Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zerrusen, Sandra)
November 7, 2017 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance of Andrew N. Schock by Sandra K. Zerrusen filed by on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra)
November 7, 2017 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance of Aaron E. McQueen by Sandra K. Zerrusen filed by on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra) Modified on 11/14/2017. s/ by Aaron E. McQueen (G,CA).
November 7, 2017 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance of Sandra K. Zerrusen by Sandra K. Zerrusen filed by on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra)
November 7, 2017 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance of Mark W. Bernlohr by Sandra K. Zerrusen filed by on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra) Modified on 11/14/2017. s/ by Mark W. Bernlohr (G,CA).
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Peter J. Flowers for Plaintiff. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #3 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/31/2017.(K,K)
October 30, 2017 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Peter J. Flowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8390784, filed by Plaintiff Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration)(Kennedy, R.) Modified duplicate text on 10/31/2017 (G,CA).
October 16, 2017 Notice to Attorney Peter J. Flowers. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
October 13, 2017 Notice of failure to register for CM/ECF. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Non-compliant attorney: Stuart I. Garson. (S,SR)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
October 13, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
October 13, 2017 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (S,SR)
October 13, 2017 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8367054. Filed by Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kennedy, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Aaron E. McQueen
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Represented By: Mark W. Bernlohr
Represented By: Andrew N. Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Hadden
Represented By: Brian K. Murphy
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No. 38 IBEW Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Daniel P. Goetz
Represented By: Don Barrett
Represented By: James A. DeRoche
Represented By: Stuart I. Garson
Represented By: R. Eric Kennedy
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?