City of Toledo v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: City of Toledo
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Perry Fine, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Lynn Webster, Actavis PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Mylan Specialty, L.P., Richard S. Sackler, Anda, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Prescription Supply, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Mylan Pharms, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technologies, Kroger Co., David A. Sackler, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Miami-Luken, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreen, Co., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, John N. Kapoor, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Rite Aid Corp. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2017op45005
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lucas
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by Scott D. Simpkins filed by on behalf of City of Toledo. (Simpkins, Scott)
April 2, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 27 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Specialty, L.P.; Mylan Pharms, Inc.; Sandoz, Inc.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.; Rite Aid Corp.; Kroger Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Prescription Supply, Inc.; Omnicare Distribution; Center LLC Walgreen, Co.; Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; John N. Kapoor; Mallinckrodt LLC; CVS Health Corporation; Miami-Luken, Inc.; Noramco, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; Wal-Mart Inc.; and Mallinckrodt PLC.. Filed by City of Toledo. (Badala, Salvatore)
November 6, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Adam W. Loukx and adding attorney filed by City of Toledo. (Charles, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of City of Toledo. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of City of Toledo. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) dismissing Defendant Russell Portenoy (related doc. #22 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 3/22/18. (P,R)
March 20, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Russell Portenoy. (Spencer, S.)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #21 Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw #20 Motion to Remand to State Court. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804) on 1/11/18.(P,R)
January 9, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to withdraw document filed by Plaintiff City of Toledo. Related document(s) #20 . (Climaco, John)
December 29, 2017 Filing 20 WITHDRAWN Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff City of Toledo. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Climaco, John) Modified on 1/11/2018 (P,R).
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Paul J. Napoli, Joseph L. Ciaccio and Salvatore C. Badala. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Docs #16 , #18 , #19 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/11/2017(C,KA)
December 8, 2017 Filing 19 Motion for attorney Salvatore C. Badala to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8453411, filed by Plaintiff City of Toledo. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
December 8, 2017 Filing 18 Motion for attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8453406, filed by Plaintiff City of Toledo. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Attorney Charles Lifland for Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #14 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/8/2017.(SG,D)
December 8, 2017 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Paul J. Napoli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8453395, filed by Plaintiff City of Toledo. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement and Oath)(Climaco, John) (G,CA).
December 8, 2017 Filing 15 Marginal Entry Order granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Russell Portenoy answer due 2/14/2018. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/8/2017.(SG,D)
December 7, 2017 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Charles C. Lifland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8450730, filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Rice, Justin)
December 6, 2017 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Lewis, John)
December 6, 2017 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Justin E. Rice filed by on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (Rice, Justin) Modified text on 12/11/2017 (R,Ke).
December 6, 2017 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by John Q. Lewis filed by on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (Lewis, John) Modified text on 12/11/2017 (R,Ke).
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Salvatore C. Badala. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Joseph L. Ciaccio. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Paul J. Napoli. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Alvin L. Emch. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Shannon E. McClure. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Robert A. Nicholas. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney J. Matthew Donohue. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Notice to Attorney Charles C. Lifland. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA)
December 5, 2017 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (M,L)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/5/2017. (D,L)
December 4, 2017 Filing 9 Notice of State Court Order Filed on November 27, 2017 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Motion)(Holzhall, Vincent)
December 4, 2017 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer until 60 days following the Pending Final Determination of Removal with Memorandum in support, filed by Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tarney, Tyler) Modified text on 12/11/2017 (R,Ke).
December 4, 2017 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 4, 2017 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Alana V. Tanoury filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Tanoury, Alana)
December 4, 2017 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Vincent I. Holzhall filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 4, 2017 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 02/14/2018 to answer Complaint to Move or Otherwise Plead filed by Defendant Russell Portenoy. Related document(s) #1 . (Rauch, Jordan)
December 4, 2017 Filing 3 Joint Motion to stay the date by which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for an extension of time pending final determination of removal on 12/31/2017 with Memorandum in support, filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daloia, Andrea) Modified text on 12/11/2017 (R,Ke).
December 1, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
December 1, 2017 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (R,Ke)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Actavis, Inc. filed by Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Daloia, Andrea)
December 1, 2017 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, case number G-4801-CI-0201704628 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-8442749. Filed by Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Service to Actavis Inc, #3 Exhibit 2 - Toledo Docket and All Documents, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff Motion to Transfer for Coordination or Consolidation MDL, #5 Exhibit 4 - Joint Response to Motion for Transfer by Manufacturer Defendants MD., #6 Exhibit 5 - Joseph v. Baxter International 614_F.Supp.2d_868, #7 Exhibit 6 - McDowell County v McKesson Corp 2017 WL 2843614, #8 Exhibit 7 - City of Huntington v AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation 2017 WL 3.) (Daloia, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Toledo v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Hobart
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Matthew Benov
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Matthew M. Benov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: James B. Hadden
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Represented By: Alvin L. Emch
Represented By: Shannon E. McClure
Represented By: Aaron E. McQueen
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Represented By: Mark W. Bernlohr
Represented By: Andrew N. Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E. Rice
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Brian M. Ercole
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescription Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Toledo
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Patrick G. Warner
Represented By: Adam W. Loukx
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael W. Czack
Represented By: D. Scott Kalish
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Represented By: Dale R. Emch
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Charles
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?