NPF Franchising, LLC v. SY Dawgs, LLC
Plaintiff: NPF Franchising, LLC
Defendant: SY Dawgs, LLC and Joel A. Bartsch
Case Number: 1:2018cv00277
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C. Nugent
Presiding Judge: William H. Baughman
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Request for Extension of Time to Intervene, File Objections on Behalf of Buchalter Law Firm and Request to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (Docket # 242 ) and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff in this Case (Docket # 244 ) are hereby DENIED. Buchalter may file a Supplement to its Objections to the Report and Recommendation no later than October 30, 2020, should there be any additional information it believes the Court should consider. SY Dawgs shall have 10 days thereafter to file a response. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/23/2020. (M,S)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Defendants' Motion for Discovery Sanctions (Docket # 114 ) is hereby DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery (Docket # 140 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff must respond to the foregoing request s, in their entirety, within 14 days of this Order, or certify to the Court that they have fully responded to all of the discovery requests propounded by Defendants and there is nothing responsive left to produce. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and for Discovery Sanctions (Docket # 143 ) is hereby DENIED. The issue of sanctions may be revisited, if warranted, when the litigation of Plaintiff's claims has concluded. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 1/25/2019. Related documents 143 , 140 , 114 . (M,S)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation re 59 that defendants' motion for attorney fees, costs, and expenses be denied without prejudice. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/09/18. (R,JM)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Baughman. Accordingly the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/29/18. (R,JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NPF Franchising, LLC v. SY Dawgs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NPF Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Alan N. Hirth
Represented By: Debra J. Horn
Represented By: T. Kinsey McInturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SY Dawgs, LLC
Represented By: Yazan S. Ashrawi
Represented By: William M. Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel A. Bartsch
Represented By: Yazan S. Ashrawi
Represented By: William M. Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?