Yanich v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Molly Anne Yanich
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01633
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal personally executed upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney on 8/21/18; and via FedEx upon the U.S. Attorney General on 8/23/18 and the Office of Regional Counsel in Chicago on 8/23/18 filed on behalf of Molly Anne Yanich. Related document(s) #7 . (S,HR)
August 1, 2018 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney's Office and Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (D,I)
August 1, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,I)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/1/2018. (D,I)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/1/2018.(D,I)
July 17, 2018 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (W,Jo)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (W,Jo)
July 17, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (W,Jo)
July 17, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (W,Jo)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Molly Anne Yanich. Related document(s) #1 . (Mosher, Louise)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Molly Anne Yanich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General - US, #3 Summons Attorney General - Northern District of Ohio, #4 Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #5 USM-285 Attorney General - US, #6 USM-285 Attorney General - Northern District, #7 USM-285 Commissioner of the Social Security Administration) (Mosher, Louise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanich v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Anne Yanich
Represented By: Louise H. Mosher
Represented By: Paula Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?