Mobile Tech, Inc. v. InVue Security Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: mobile tech, inc. and mobile technologies, inc.
Defendant: InVue Security Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01646
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order of Transfer This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/14/2018. Related document #13 . (W,CM)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 Consent Motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Motion for extension of time to answer complaint filed by Defendant InVue Security Products, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wernow, Howard) Modified text/added motion event on 9/14/2018 (M,S).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 9/25/2018. InVue Security Products, Inc. answer due 9/25/2018. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/14/2018.(W,CM)
September 14, 2018 Case electronically transferred to United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina on 9/14/2018. Related document(s) #14 . (M,S)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Norman, Forrest)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Alan H. Norman for Mobile Tech, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #11 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/21/2018.(K,K)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Alan H. Norman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8865051, filed by Plaintiff Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Alan H. Norman in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificates of Good Standing for Alan H. Norman)(Norman, Forrest)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 Joint Motion for extension of time until 9/17/2018 to answer or otherwise respond filed by Defendant InVue Security Products, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting the motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond)(Wernow, Howard)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Matthew A. Braunel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8853369, filed by Plaintiff Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew A. Braunel in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Matthew A. Braunel's Certificates of Good Standing)(Norman, Forrest)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Steven E. Garlock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8853350, filed by Plaintiff Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Steven E. Garlock in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Steven E. Garlock's Certificates of Good Standing)(Norman, Forrest)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for attorney David B. Jinkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8853329, filed by Plaintiff Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David B. Jinkins in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 David B. Jinkins' Certificates of Good Standing)(Norman, Forrest)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #10 Joint Motion for extension of time until 9/17/2018 to answer or otherwise respond. InVue Security Products, Inc. answer due 9/17/2018. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/13/2018.(K,K)
August 13, 2018 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 8/23/2018. (K,Ca)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David B. Jinkins, Steven E. Garlock, and Matthew A. Braunel for Mobile Tech, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # #7 , #8 , #9 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/13/2018.(K,K)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon InVue Security Products, Inc. on 7/25/2018, filed on behalf of Mobile Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant)(Norman, Forrest)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon InVue Security Products, Inc.. (M,S)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons to Invue Security Products, Inc. filed by Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Invue Security Products, Inc.)(Norman, Forrest)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mobile Tech, Inc.. (Norman, Forrest)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (D,Ky)
July 18, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,Ky)
July 18, 2018 Notice by Clerk that Mobile Tech, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (D,Ky)
July 18, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (D,Ky)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for injunction and damages for patent infringement with jury demand against InVue Security Products, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8809690. Filed by Mobile Tech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 10,026,281, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Application, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norman, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Tech, Inc. v. InVue Security Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mobile tech, inc.
Represented By: Forrest A. Norman, III
Represented By: Steven E. Garlock
Represented By: Matthew A. Braunel
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Alan H. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mobile technologies, inc.
Represented By: Forrest A. Norman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InVue Security Products, Inc.
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?