Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01662
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 19 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave to File Document under Seal(Related Doc #15 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/14/18.(R,JM)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Apple Inc.. Related document(s) #17 .(Alexander, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) #14 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Jaynes Decl.), #2 Exhibit B (Dialog SS Reg.), #3 Exhibit C (July 14 Ltr.), #4 Exhibit D (Assignment), #5 Exhibit E (Dissolution of Assignee), #6 Exhibit F (Lee Paper), #7 Exhibit G (Naton Patent)) (Yanchar, Georgia). Modified on 9/12/2018 filer notified of error with certificate of service page (H,SP).
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 SEALED Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Memorandum in Support #14 , #1 filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. Related document(s) #14 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Jaynes Decl.), #2 Exhibit B (July 14 Ltr.), #3 Exhibit C (Apple 10-Q))(Yanchar, Georgia)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Motion for leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Andrew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/22/2018 at 09:15 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/6/2018. (M,S)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Carolyn C. Chang for Apple Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/24/18.(R,JM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ryan J. Marton for Apple Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/24/18.(R,JM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Hector J. Ribera for Apple Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/24/18.(R,JM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David J. Austin for Apple Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #10 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/24/18.(R,JM)
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Carolyn Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8866467, filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carolyn Chang)(Alexander, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Ryan Marton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8866423, filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Marton)(Alexander, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Hector Ribera to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8866367, filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hector Ribera)(Alexander, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for attorney David Austin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8866323, filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Austin)(Alexander, Andrew)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until September 12, 2018. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/13/18.(R,JM)
August 9, 2018 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $400.00 refunded on 08/09/2018 for receipt #0647-8812446. (K,Ve)
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apple Inc.. (Yanchar, Georgia)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 12, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Yanchar, Georgia)
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Apple Inc., filed on behalf of Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd Related document(s) #3 , #2 , #1 . (Fry, Jude)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Proof of Service by personal service upon Apple Inc. on 7/23/2018, filed on behalf of Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd Related document(s) #3 , #2 , #1 . (Fry, Jude)
July 23, 2018 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate Payments. Receipt #: 0647-8812446, filed by Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd. (Fry, Jude)
July 19, 2018 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (S,SR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/19/18. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (D,MA)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ky)
July 19, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (D,Ky)
July 19, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (D,Ky)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd. (Fry, Jude)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd. (Fry, Jude)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Apple Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8812469. Filed by Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - US Pat. No. 6176947, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Fry, Jude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Singapore Asahi Chemical & Solder Industries PTE Ltd
Represented By: Jude A. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Hector J. Ribera
Represented By: David J. Austin
Represented By: Carolyn C. Chang
Represented By: Andrew W. Alexander
Represented By: Ryan J. Marton
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?