Art of Beauty Company, Inc. v. DSV Air & Sea Inc.

Plaintiff: Art of Beauty Company, Inc.
Defendant: DSV Air & Sea Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02173
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Answer to Count V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by DSV Air & Sea Inc.. Related document(s) #8 . (Zalud, Eric)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss , Motion to dismiss count I-IV of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant DSV Air & Sea Inc.. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terms and Conditions)(Zalud, Eric)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is MOOT. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/5/18. (Related Doc #5 ) (LC,S)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Instanter is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/5/18. (Related Doc #8 ) (LC,S)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for leave to File Amended Complaint, Instanter filed by Plaintiff Art of Beauty Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to First Amended Complaint - Quote, #3 Exhibit 2 to First Amended Complaint - Bill of Lading)(Feher, Thomas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Opposition to #5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Art of Beauty Company, Inc.. (Feher, Thomas)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 11/29/2018 at 8:30 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/05/18. (D,Ma)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by Defendant DSV Air & Sea Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit Terms and Conditions)(Zalud, Eric)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent DSV A/S for DSV Air & Sea Inc. filed by DSV Air & Sea Inc.. (Zalud, Eric)
September 21, 2018 Notice by Clerk that DSV Air & Sea Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
September 21, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
September 21, 2018 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (S,SR)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by DSV Air & Sea Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Zalud, Eric)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV18902467 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8920347. Filed by DSV Air & Sea Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, Summons & Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Zalud, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Art of Beauty Company, Inc. v. DSV Air & Sea Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSV Air & Sea Inc.
Represented By: Eric Larson Zalud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art of Beauty Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Feher
Represented By: Caitlin R. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?