Davis v. Helbling

Appellant: Camille T. Davis
Appellee: Lauren A. Helbling
Case Number: 1:2018cv02264
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Motion Permission To Take Direct Appeal To Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Appellant Camille T. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confirmation Order, #2 Exhibit May 24, 2018 Confirmation Hearing Transcript)(Romano, Joseph)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Certification of Direct Appeal to the Court of Appeals Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2) and Bankruptcy 8006(f). (S,SR)
October 1, 2018 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Arthur Harris, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 17-12965, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (S,SR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (S,SR)
October 1, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
October 1, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated 9/13/2018. Filed by Camille T. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Transmission form, #2 USBC order, #3 USBC docket) (S,SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Helbling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Camille T. Davis
Represented By: Joseph M. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lauren A. Helbling
Represented By: Lauren A. Helbling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?