MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Progressive Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 15-09-157, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series 16-11-509
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Group of Insurance Companies, Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern and Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02273
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/19/21. (S,HR)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the parties' joint #55 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/19/21.(S,HR)
October 8, 2020 Filing 67 Response to Defendants' Position Paper Following Limited Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #64 .(Turner, Tracy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 66 SEALED Document: Exhibit B filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Related document(s) #42 , #65 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Bates No. 714, #2 Exhibit E - Bates No. 537-538, #3 Exhibit F - Bates No. 3487, #4 Exhibit G - Bates No. 3213, #5 Exhibit I - Bates No. 4821-4822, #6 Exhibit J - Bates No. 2514, #7 Exhibit K - Bates No. 2516, #8 Exhibit N - Bates No. 6017, #9 Exhibit M - Bates No. 5932) (Turner, Tracy). Modified on 9/17/2020, attorney contacted regarding the lack of case caption and signature block (H,SP).
September 15, 2020 Filing 65 Position paper and proposed case management order filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HHS Brief, #2 Exhibit D - J. R Conditional Payment Info, #3 Exhibit H - T.M Conditional Payment Info, #4 Exhibit L - C.P Conditional Payment Info)(Turner, Tracy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 64 Position paper following limited discovery filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order, #2 Exhibit B - August 20, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Response to First Set of Interrogatories)Related document(s) #61 .(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David M. Hundley for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #63 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/17/2020.(D, I)
August 14, 2020 Filing 63 Motion for attorney David M. Hundley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10185061, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Hundley, #2 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 62 Stipulation & Order re #55 Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/4/2020. (D, I)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Discovery (Related Doc #53 ). Plaintiffs' Motion to Request Case Management Conference is moot. (Related Doc #60 ). The limited discovery cut-off date is September 1, 2020. No later than September 15, 2020 the parties shall submit position papers on the results of discovery and shall include a proposed case management plan in light of the limited discovery. The Court will then decide how to proceed after reviewing the parties position papers. Because the Court will determine how to proceed after review of the parties' position papers, Plaintiffs' Motion to Request Case Management Conference is denied as moot. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/4/2020.(D, I)
May 29, 2020 Filing 60 Motion for relief Request for Case Management Conference filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Turner, Tracy)
May 19, 2020 Filing 59 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Covington Report and Recommendation Denying Motion to Dismiss)Related document(s) #56 .(Turner, Tracy)
May 15, 2020 Filing 58 SEALED Document:Exhibit A to Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related document(s) #42 , #57 . (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2020 Filing 57 Reply in support of #53 Motion to bifurcate Discovery filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payments Summary Sheet)(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 56 Opposition to #53 Motion to bifurcate Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(Turner, Tracy)
May 6, 2020 Filing 55 Joint Motion Entry of Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information)(Turner, Tracy)
April 24, 2020 Filing 54 SEALED Document: Exhibit B to Motion to Bifurcate - Claims Data filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #42 , #53 ). (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2020 Filing 53 Motion to bifurcate Discovery filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Claims Data, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents)(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order In light of General Orders 2020-5 and 2020-5-1, the Court cancels all in-person and telephone Case Management and Status Conferences through May 1, 2020. In lieu of the CMCs and Status Conferences, the parties shall file enhanced Rule 26 Reports or Joint Status Reports as described herein. All existing deadlines on civil proceedings for discovery, amendments, mediations, special master duties and dispositive motions are extended sixty days. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/24/2020.
March 16, 2020 Filing 51 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Tracy)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Shannon A. Shelton for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #50 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/10/2020.(D, I)
February 6, 2020 Filing 50 Motion for attorney Shannon A. Shelton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9770261, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shannon Shelton, #2 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 29, 2020 As of January 6, 2020 Judge Christopher Boyko has taken Senior Status. Effective February 3, 2020, Judge Boyko is moving his chambers to the Howard Metzenbaum Courthouse located at 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio 44114. His office will be located in the East Chambers Rm 328. The Court will maintain courtroom facilities at Courtroom 15B of the Carl B. Stokes Courthouse so please consult the docket for the location of any upcoming proceedings. The phone number will remain 216 357-7151 so any telephonic conferences will not be affected by the change in location. (SL) (ADI)
January 28, 2020 Filing 49 Attorney Appearance by Timothy H. Lee filed by on behalf of Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Lee, Timothy)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Timothy H. Lee for Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, and Progressive Select Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #48 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/21/20.(S,HR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 48 Motion for attorney Timothy H. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9725155, filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Unopposed Motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Courtney L. Stidham removed from case. (Related Doc #47 ) Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/14/2020.(D, I)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 7, 2020 Filing 47 Unopposed Motion by Courtney L. Stidham to withdraw as attorney filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Stidham, Courtney)
December 27, 2019 Filing 46 Answer to #43 First Amended class action complaint, for damages and demand for jury trial filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #45 Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 27, 2019 to answer. Progressive Preferred Insurance Company answer due 12/27/2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/6/2019.(D, I)
December 5, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 27, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendants' #44 Motion for extension of time to answer. Progressive American Insurance Company answer due 12/27/2019; Progressive Select Insurance Company answer due 12/27/2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/4/19.(S,HR)
November 27, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 27, 2019 to to File a Response or Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 43 First Amended complaint against Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company and adding new party defendant(s) Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. Filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J.R. Claims Data, #2 Exhibit B- J.R. Ability Report, #3 Exhibit C- L.B. Claims Data, #4 Exhibit D- L.B Ability Report, #5 Exhibit E- Progressive Reporting to CMS, #6 Exhibit F- T. M. Claims Data, #7 Exhibit G- T.M. Ability Report, #8 Exhibit H- C.P. Claims Data, #9 Exhibit I- C.P Ability Report, #10 Exhibit J- FHCP- La Ley Assignment, #11 Exhibit K- La Ley- MSPA Assignment, #12 Exhibit L- Receiver Settlement Agreement, #13 Exhibit M- Court Order Approving Settlement, #14 Exhibit N- IMC-MSP Recovery Assignment, #15 Exhibit O- MSP- MSPA Assignment, #16 Exhibit P- IMC Affidavit, #17 Exhibit Q-Connecticare Assignment, #18 Exhibit R- SummaCare- MSP Recovery Assignment, #19 Exhibit S- SummaCare MSP Series Assignment) (Turner, Tracy)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #41 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint until 10 Days After the Court rules on Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. No further extensions. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/18/2019.(D, I)
November 13, 2019 Filing 42 Protective Order regarding confidential documents, with acknowledgment and agreement attached. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/13/2019. (D, I)
November 12, 2019 Filing 41 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 40 Joint Motion for protective order filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Turner, Tracy)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #39 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint until November 12, 2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/1/2019.(D, I)
October 28, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint until November 12, 2019 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #38 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint until October 28, 2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/22/2019.(D, I)
October 21, 2019 Filing 38 Motion for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint until October 28, 2019 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #37 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 10/21/2019 to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/11/201.(D, I)
October 9, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed Motion for extension of Deadline to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint until October 21, 2019 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 36 Opinion and Order. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF #28 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants Defendants' Motion, in part and dismisses Plaintiffs' claims against The Progressive Group of Insurance Companies, Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management and Progressive Corporation. The Court denies Defendants' Motion as to the remaining Defendants. The Court further Orders Plaintiffs to submit an Amended Complaint no later than October 11, 2019, linking each representative Plaintiff's claim to a specific Defendant. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/17/2019.(W,CM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Memorandum Decision and Order )Related document(s) #28 .(Cashdan, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (S,SR).
September 12, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Memorandum Opinion And Order)Related document(s) #30 .(Turner, Tracy)
July 1, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko reassigned to case, Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. (B,R) Related document #33 Corrected Order of Recusal.
July 1, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. Related document #33 Order of Recusal. (B,R)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Christopher A. Boyko for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/28/2019. (L,Ja) Modified on 7/1/2019, Judge Patricia A. Gaughan entered in error (L,Ja).
June 28, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela A. Barker pursuant to General Order 2019-13. (B,R)
May 23, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Tenet Memorandum Opinion, #2 Exhibit B- AIX Order)Related document(s) #30 .(Turner, Tracy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 31 Reply in support of #28 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Cashdan, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 30 Opposition to #28 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Tracy)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs' #29 Motion to extend deadlines; Plaintiffs' Opposition due by 1/25/2019 and Defendants' Reply due by 2/16/2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/17/2019.(H,CM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed Motion for extension of Response and Reply to Motion to Dismiss until Janaruy 25, 2019; February 16, 2019 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Tracy)
December 17, 2018 Filing 28 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Uth)(Cashdan, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Court cancels Case Management Conference (CMC) and adopts parties' proposed briefing schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Motion due by 12/17/2018; Opposition due by 1/18/2019; and Reply by 2/9/2019. Should the Motion be denied, the Court will contact the parties to set a new telephone CMC date and time. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/17/2018. (H,CM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 27 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Tracy)
December 14, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Select Insurance Company filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Northwestern filed by Progressive Northwestern. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. filed by Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Classic Insurance filed by Progressive Classic Insurance. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Progressive Corporation. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive American Insurance Company filed by Progressive American Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth) Modified on 12/14/2018 (S,SR).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Progressive Casualty's Motion for attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #16 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/11/2018.(H,CM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance of Zachary A. McEntyre by Kenneth G. Prabucki filed by on behalf of Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related document(s) #16 .(Prabucki, Kenneth) s/ by Zachary A. McEntyre. Modified text on 12/14/2018 (S,SR).
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance of Emily S. Newton by Kenneth G. Prabucki filed by on behalf of Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related document(s) #12 .(Prabucki, Kenneth) s/ by Emily Newton. Modified text on 12/14/2018 (S,SR).
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance of David J. Farber by Kenneth G. Prabucki filed by on behalf of Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related document(s) #11 .(Prabucki, Kenneth) s/ By David Farbe. Modified text on 12/14/2018 (S,SR).
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance of Jeffrey S. Cashdan by Kenneth G. Prabucki filed by on behalf of Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related document(s) #10 .(Prabucki, Kenneth) s/ by Jeffrey S. Cashdan. Modified text on 12/14/2018 (S,SR).
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9045805, filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion to Conduct the December 17, 2018 Case Management Conference by Telephone filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Progressive Casualty's Motions for attorneys Jeffrey S. Cashdan, David J. Farber and Emily S. Newton to appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #'s #10 , #11 , #12 ). Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/6/2018.(H,CM)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Progressive Casualty's Motion to conduct conference by telephone (Related Doc #15 ); case management conference will be telephonic. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate conference with opposing counsel and contact the Court at 216-357-7151. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/6/2018.(H,CM)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Michael K. Farrell filed by on behalf of Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Kenneth G. Prabucki filed by on behalf of Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Emily S. Newton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9037130, filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for attorney David J. Farber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9037109, filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9037058, filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Prabucki, Kenneth)
November 21, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]. Case management conference reset* to be held on 12/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. (*Please note new date and time.) (H,CM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Consent to Transfer and Order of Transfer of a Refiled Case: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.1(b)(4), a case which is refiled after being discontinued, dismissed, or remanded shall be assigned to the same District Judge who received the initial case assignment. The undersigned are the transferor and transferee judges consenting to the transfer of this refiled case. This case is hereby transferred as a refiling of Case Number 1:17 CV 00390. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/19/18. (LC,S) re #7
November 19, 2018 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. (S,SR)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion to reassign case to Judge Christopher A. Boyko filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Michael K. Farrell filed by on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Kenneth G. Prabucki filed by on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Prabucki, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 12/12/2018 at 8:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/02/18. (D,Ma)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
October 2, 2018 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (S,SR)
October 2, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series 15-09-157, Series 16-11-509. (Turner, Tracy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Progressive American Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Claims Management, Progressive Classic Insurance, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Group of Insurance Companies, Progressive Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8936652. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 1:17-cv-00390. Filed by Series 15-09-157, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 16-11-509. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata A - LB Claims Data, #3 Exhibit B - Progressive Reporting, #4 Exhibit C - LB Ability, #5 Exhibit D - JR Claims Data, #6 Exhibit E - JR Ability, #7 Exhibit F - TM Claims Data, #8 Exhibit G - TM Ability, #9 Exhibit H - CP Claims Data, #10 Exhibit I - CP Ability, #11 Exhibit J - FHCP Agreement, #12 Exhibit K - La Ley MSPA Assignment, #13 Exhibit L - Receiver Settlement Agreement, #14 Exhibit M - Order Approving Settlement, #15 Exhibit N - IMC Agreement, #16 Exhibit O - MSP-MSPA Assignment, #17 Exhibit P - IMC Affidavit, #18 Exhibit Q - Connecticare Assignment, #19 Exhibit R - Summacare MSP Recovery Assignment, #20 Exhibit S - Summacare MSP Series Assignment) (Turner, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Progressive Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Claims Management
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Corporation
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Classic Insurance
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Group of Insurance Companies
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northwestern
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Emily S. Newton
Represented By: David J. Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth G. Prabucki
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Timothy H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Courtney L. Stidham
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: R. Brent Wisner
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Represented By: David M. Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 15-09-157
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Courtney L. Stidham
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: R. Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Courtney L. Stidham
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: R. Brent Wisner
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Represented By: David M. Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 16-11-509
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Courtney L. Stidham
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: R. Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?