Eyssen v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jon W. Eyssen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv02311
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #6 Motion for extension of time until February 4, 2019 to answer complaint. United States of America answer due 2/4/2019. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/29/2018.(R,Sh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until February 4, 2019 to answer complaint filed by Defendant United States of America. (Hume, Lauren)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon United States of America on 10/5/18, and on Commissioner, Internal Revenue Service on 10/10/2018, filed on behalf of Jon W. Eyssen. (H,D)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/10/2018 filed on behalf of Jon W. Eyssen. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,S)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,Ky)
October 4, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney General Receipt # 7018 0360 0001 7554 1275, Internal Revenue Service Receipt # 7018 0360 0001 7554 1268 and U.S Attorney Receipt # 7018 0360 0001 7554 1282 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (D,Ky)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons issued to counsel over the counter for service upon United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney, Internal Revenue Service and U.S. Attorney General. (D,Ky)
October 4, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (D,Ky)
October 4, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (D,Ky)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against United States of America. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660108331. Filed by Jon W. Eyssen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - IRS penalty forms, #3 Exhibit B - Form 843, #4 Exhibit C - Form 843, #5 Exhibit D - Form 843, #6 Exhibit E - Form 843, #7 Exhibit F -Form 843, #8 Exhibit G - Letter) (D,Ky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyssen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lauren E. Hume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon W. Eyssen
Represented By: Gordon E. Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?