Blank v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lois M Blank and Lois Blank
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association as Trustee as successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu M and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2018cv02320
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of with case management conference to be held on 12/10/2018 at 09:30 AM. Note that this change is in start time only. (W,CM)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #11 Motion to excuse personal attendance of party representative at the December 10, 2018 Case Management Conference. Defendants' party representative must participate by phone. Defendants should consider the amount saved by attending telephonically when making a settlement offer. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/21/2018.(K,K)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to attend by telephone filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #10 . (Wallace, David)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/19/2018. (K,K)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss count filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout, #2 Exhibit B, Auditor's Map)(Wallace, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Lois Blank. (Broyles, Bruce)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Acknowledgement of receipt received from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #6 . (S,SR)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 State court documents received from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas case number 2018 cv 572. Original record returned to Ashtabula County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Ashtabula County Court) (S,L)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout)(Wallace, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Cadieux, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Cadieux, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Notice by Clerk that U.S. Bank National Association and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (W,Jo)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,Jo)
October 5, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (W,Jo)
October 5, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (W,Jo)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CV0572 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8944057.. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association and Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B, State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blank v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Represented By: Karen M. Cadieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association as Trustee as successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu M
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Represented By: Karen M. Cadieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois M Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Blank
Represented By: Bruce M. Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?