United States of America v. $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Stefan Sathasivam
Case Number: 1:2018cv02522
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See # General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (M,L)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Stefan Sathasivam. (Marein, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Verified Claim of Interest of Stefan Sathasivam in Defendant's Property filed by Stefan Sathasivam. (Marein, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - Help desk call request, attorney to refile. VERIFIED CLAIM OF INTEREST OF STEFAN SATHASIVAM IN DEFENDANT PROPERTY filed by $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency. (Marein, Mark) Modified as error on 11/29/2018 (P,WL).
November 1, 2018 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Stefan Sathasivam c/o Mark B. Marein placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70150640000293372603. (B,R)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (B,R)
November 1, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
November 1, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 CBP Process Receipt and Return, #5 Notice) (Tripi, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,880.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Mark B. Marein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stefan Sathasivam
Represented By: Mark B. Marein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip J. Tripi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?