Vanauken et al v. Severino Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chad Vanauken and Keri Vanauken
Defendant: J Severino Construction, Inc., Severino Construction, Inc., Lauren A. Bugansky, John Does #1-40, Robison Trucking, Inc. and Dennis M. Berg
Case Number: 1:2018cv02525
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR: The Court consolidates the instant case with Case No. 1:18CV01989. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:18CV01989. (see Order to Consolidate #5 . First Amended complaint against Lauren A. Bugansky, J. Severino Construction, Inc., Severino Construction, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) Robison Trucking, Inc. and Dennis M. Berg. Filed by Kathy Stein, Joseph M. Stein. (Attachments: #1 Summons) Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01989-JG, 1:18-cv-02525-JG (Lebovitz, Jordan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to Counsel for service upon Dennis M. Berg, Lauren A. Bugansky, J Severino Construction, Inc., Robison Trucking, Inc. (at Iowa Avenue address and S. Houser Street address) Severino Construction, Inc. (L,Ja)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Supplement to Amended complaint, - Request for Issuance of Summons, filed by Chad Vanauken, Keri Vanauken. Related document(s)(6 in 1:18-cv-02525-JG, 21 in 1:18-cv-01989-JG). (Melick, Gregory)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 Amended complaint against Lauren A. Bugansky, J Severino Construction, Inc., Severino Construction, Inc., adding new party defendant(s) Robison Trucking, Dennis Berg, John Does #1-40. Filed by Chad Vanauken, Keri Vanauken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01989-JG, 1:18-cv-02525-JG (Melick, Gregory)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Consolidate signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/8/18. The Court consolidates the instant case with Case No. 1:18CV01989. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:18CV01989. (D,MA)
November 6, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that the Court shall hold a consolidated case management conference with that of Case No. 18cv1989 Stein v. Severino Construction, Inc., et al on 11/8/18 at 8:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. (D,MA)
November 5, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, Judge Christopher A. Boyko terminated. (S,SR)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment as related to 1:18CV1989 to Judge James S. Gwin for all further proceedings. Judges Christopher A. Boyko and James S. Gwin on 11/5/2018. (H,CM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
November 1, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
November 1, 2018 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (S,SR)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet (corrected), filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Melick, Gregory)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8988341. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:18-cv-01989. Filed by Chad Vanauken, Keri Vanauken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses) (Melick, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanauken et al v. Severino Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Severino Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Severino Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren A. Bugansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robison Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Vanauken
Represented By: Gregory H. Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Vanauken
Represented By: Gregory H. Melick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?