United States of America v. A&W Roofing, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: A&W Roofing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02572
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (M,L)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for default judgment against A&W ROOFING, L.L.C. with attached. Application for entry of default, declaration in support of service, declaration of amount due and proposed default judgment. filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rokakis, Alex)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service by Federal Express executed upon A&W Roofing, L.L.C. on 11/12/2018, filed on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B. Fed Ex Del. Receipt)(Rokakis, Alex)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon A&W Roofing, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
November 8, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
November 8, 2018 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (B,R)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against A&W Roofing, L.L.C. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Indebtedness, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Indebtedness, #3 Exhibit Cert. of Indebtedness, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rokakis, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. A&W Roofing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&W Roofing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alex Rokakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?