United States of America v. Mehdizadeh et al

Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Marble Builder Direct International Inc., Cuyahoga County Treasurer, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Farhad Mehdizadeh and Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio
Case Number: 1:2018cv02718
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (P, S)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Marble Builder Direct International Inc. waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Farhad Mehdizadeh waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Marble Builder Direct International Inc., Farhad Mehdizadeh, Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio. (T,Je)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Farhad Mehdizadeh, #2 Summons Marble Builder Direct International, Inc., #3 Summons JPMorgan Chase, #4 Summons Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio)(Stallings, Mary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR- to be refiled - Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Farhad Mehdizadeh Summons, #2 Summons Marble Builder Direct International, Inc. Summons, #3 Summons JPMorgan Chase Summons, #4 Summons Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio Summons)(Stallings, Mary) Modified to mark error on 11/27/2018 (O,K).
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons provided or issued. (T,Je)
November 23, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
November 23, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Chernoff, Stephanie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stallings, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mehdizadeh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marble Builder Direct International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farhad Mehdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?