Holmes v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lamaria D. Holmes
Defendant: Frank Battaglia and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02774
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
0 Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
1 Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Per attorneys Barry Murner and Natalie Stevens, case is settled. The Court anticipates a dismissal entry on or before 2/28/19. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/22/19. (LC,S)
December 7, 2018 6 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Frank Battaglia, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Rendall, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 1/29/2019 at 8:45 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/03/18. (D,Ma)
December 3, 2018 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/30/18. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (D,MA)
November 30, 2018 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
November 30, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
November 30, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (S,SR)
November 30, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc., The for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Stevens, Natalie)
November 30, 2018 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 18 906144 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9032761.. Filed by Frank Battaglia, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stevens, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Battaglia
Represented By: Russell T. Rendall
Represented By: Natalie M. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Russell T. Rendall
Represented By: Natalie M. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamaria D. Holmes
Represented By: Barry R. Murner
Represented By: Corinne A. Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?