United States of America v. Taurus PT111 G2 Pistol, 9 Caliber, Serial Number: TLN17929
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Taurus PT111 G2 Pistol, 9 Caliber, Serial Number: TLN17929
Interested Party: Terry Caston
Case Number: 1:2018cv02821
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Agreement filed by United States of America. (Morford, James)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 ATF Return Executed on 12/13/18. filed by United States of America. (Morford, James)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Terry Caston on 1/16/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America (Morford, James)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case for a period of 14 days due to the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government. See #General Order 2018-15 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/26/2018. (H,SN)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Marshal's Return on Warrant of Arrest in Rem returned unexecuted on 12/7/2018. The US Marshal Service does not maintain custody of ATF weapons. Please re-issue to ATF. Related document(s) #3 . (M,S)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for Taurus PT111 G2 Pistol, 9 Caliber, Serial Number: TLN17929 issued to U.S. Marshal on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,SR)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,SR)
December 7, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
December 7, 2018 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against Taurus PT111 G2 Pistol, 9 Caliber, Serial Number: TLN17929. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USM Process Receipt and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Morford, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Taurus PT111 G2 Pistol, 9 Caliber, Serial Number: TLN17929
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Terry Caston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus PT111 G2 Pistol, 9 Caliber, Serial Number: TLN17929
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James L. Morford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?