C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. P. K. Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., The Players Sales, Inc. and Original Produce Distributing Inc.
Defendant: Paul G.A. Kasapis, P. K. Produce, Inc., Sipasak Properties, LLC and Debra Kasapis
Interested Party: B & D Produce Sales LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02849
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Original Produce Distributing Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., The Players Sales, Inc.. Sipasak Properties, LLC waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019 filed on behalf of Original Produce Distributing Inc.; C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.; The Players Sales, Inc. (Amendola, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Original Produce Distributing Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., The Players Sales, Inc.. Debra Kasapis waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019 filed on behalf of Original Produce Distributing Inc.; C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.; The Players Sales, Inc. (Amendola, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Original Produce Distributing Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., The Players Sales, Inc.. P. K. Produce, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019 filed on behalf of Original Produce Distributing Inc.; C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.; The Players Sales, Inc. (Amendola, Mark)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case filed by B & D Produce Sales LLC. (Stokes, Craig)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Amended complaint against Debra Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, P. K. Produce, Inc., Sipasak Properties, LLC and adding new party plaintiff(s) Original Produce Distributing, Inc. and The Players Sales, Inc. Filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Original Produce Distributing Inc., The Players Sales, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Statements of Account and Unpaid Invoices) (Amendola, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Debra Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, P. K. Produce, Inc., Sipasak Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
December 12, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
December 12, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (S,SR)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Amendola, Mark)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(Amendola, Mark)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Debra Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, P. K. Produce, Inc., Sipasak Properties, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9048162. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:18-cv-2754. Filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account and Unpaid Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for P.K. Produce, Inc., #4 Summons for Paul G.A. Kasapis, #5 Summons for Debra Kasapis, #6 Summons for Sipasak Properties, LLC) (Amendola, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. P. K. Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G.A. Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. K. Produce, Inc.
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sipasak Properties, LLC
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kasapis
Represented By: George J. Argie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Players Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Original Produce Distributing Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: B & D Produce Sales LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?