United States of America v. Curry et al

Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: State of Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Bureau of Unemployment Compensation Tax, Richard L Curry, Richland County Treasurer, Shelley L Curry, Rodney L Curry, Yvonne Curry, State of Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation and State of Ohio Department of Taxation
Case Number: 1:2018cv02874
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Richland County Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tax Bills)(Elgin, Jonathon)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio Department of Taxation waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Bureau of Unemployment Compensation Tax waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (P, S)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Richland County Treasurer waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Rodney L Curry, Shelley L Curry, Yvonne Curry. (P,WL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rodney L. Curry, #2 Summons Shelley L. Curry, #3 Summons Yvonne Curry)(Stallings, Mary)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and none were issued. (B,R)
December 14, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
December 14, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stallings, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Bureau of Unemployment Compensation Tax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland County Treasurer
Represented By: Jonathon C. Elgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley L Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney L Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio Department of Taxation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?