Kolar v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Kolar
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and Purple Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02902
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Case Management Order: Case Management Conference was held on 2/15/19. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is not suitable for Mediation/Settlement Conference at any time. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before N/A. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before N/A for party with burden of proof & N/A for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before N/A. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before 3/1/19. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 4/30/19. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/21/19 at 8:45 a.m. The Court will initiate the call with attorneys only. However, the parties must be available for immediate contact. Counsel shall confer within three business days of any scheduled conference to discuss outstanding issues and respective positions as to settlement. Counsel shall provide to the Court within two business days of the conference, a joint Status Report or confidential individual Status Reports describing the status of discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. The Status Report(s) need not be filed, but may be delivered via e-mail at Gaughan_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/15/19. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins.
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Kathy Kolar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. CIV. 26 (f) and L.R. 16.3 (b))(Oberholtzer, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation & Order of Defendant Purple Communications, Inc., Without Prejudice is So Ordered. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/25/19. (LC,S) re #4
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Brenner, Todd)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prjudice as to Defendant Purple Communications, Inc. filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 .(Brenner, Todd)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 2/15/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/10/19. (D,Ma)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Purple Communications, Inc., United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
December 18, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
December 18, 2018 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (B,R)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9058436. Filed by Kathy Kolar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Omaha Insurance, #3 Summons for Purple Communications, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Plan/Coverage) (Oberholtzer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolar v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Kolar
Represented By: John C. Oberholtzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd A. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purple Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?