B & D Produce Sales, LLC v. P.K. Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B & D Produce Sales, LLC
Defendant: P.K. Produce, Inc., Sipasak Properties, LLC, Debra Kasapis and Paul G. Kasapis
Case Number: 1:2018cv02906
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Sheriff's Office at Morgantown FCI, County of Monongalia, State of West Virginia executed upon Paul G. Kasapis on 2/7/2019, filed on behalf of B & D Produce Sales, LLC (Stokes, Craig)
February 12, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (S,SR)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr., for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/12/2019. (K,K)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by B & D Produce Sales, LLC. Debra Kasapis waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; P.K. Produce, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019; Sipasak Properties, LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 filed on behalf of B & D Produce Sales, LLC (Stokes, Craig)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon P.K. Produce, Inc. on 12/27/2018, filed on behalf of B & D Produce Sales, LLC Related document(s) #1 . (Stokes, Craig)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Supplement to Complaint, - Amended Civil Cover Sheet, filed by B & D Produce Sales, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Stokes, Craig)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Debra Kasapis, P.K. Produce, Inc., Paul G. Kasapis, Sipasak Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
December 18, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
December 18, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by B & D Produce Sales, LLC. (Stokes, Craig)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Debra Kasapis, P.K. Produce, Inc., Paul G. Kasapis, Sipasak Properties, LLC. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:18cv2754-SO Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9059124. Filed by B & D Produce Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to All Defendants) (Stokes, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B & D Produce Sales, LLC v. P.K. Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & D Produce Sales, LLC
Represented By: Craig A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.K. Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sipasak Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G. Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?