Microsoft Corporation v. World Tech Investments LLC et al

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: Konstantin Verni and World Tech Investments LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02915
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/24/19 setting a conference for 3/7/19 at 10:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1) (D,MA)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/24/19 approving the parties' stipulation for an extension of time until 2/28/19 for defendants to respond to plaintiff's complaint. The Court requires the filing of an answer. (Related Doc. #11 ) (D,MA)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 1/24/19. (D,MA)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by February 28, 2019 filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #1 .(Turner, Mark)
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Karon, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/18/19 granting the motions to appear pro hac vice of Attorneys James H. Corning and Bonnie E. MacNaughton on behalf of plaintiff. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Docs. #8 and #9 ) (D,MA)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Bonnie E. MacNaughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9096287, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for PHV Admission of Bonnie MacNaughton, #2 Affidavit of Bonnie MacNaughton)(Karon, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for attorney James Harlan Corning to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9096246, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for PHV Admission of James Harlan Corning, #2 Affidavit of James Harlan Corning)(Karon, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon World Tech Investments LLC on 1/8/2019, filed on behalf of Microsoft Corporation Related document(s) #4 , #5 . (W,CM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Konstantin Verni on 1/5/2019, filed on behalf of Microsoft Corporation Related document(s) #4 , #5 . (W,CM)
January 3, 2019 Service by Clerk placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Summons and Complaint addressed to Konstantin Verni at 34194 Aurora Road #301, Solon, OH, receipt # 70123460000130357824; Konstantin Verni at 38220 McDowell Dr, Solon, OH, receipt # 70123460000130369667; and World Tech Investments LLC, Receipt # 70123460000130357831. (H,D)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to Counsel for service upon Konstantin Verni (2 addresses), World Tech Investments LLC. (L,Ja)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons Upon Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons WTI Summons, #2 Summons Verni Summons 1, #3 Summons Verni Summons 2)(Karon, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Noticeof filing forms AO120 AND AO121 filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Form AO120 #2 Exhibit B, Form AO121)(Karon, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Notice by Clerk that Microsoft Corporation failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (B,R)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
December 19, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
December 19, 2018 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9061579. Filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Cert of Registration, #3 Exhibit 2- Cert of Registration, #4 Exhibit 3- Cert of Registration, #5 Exhibit 4- Cert of Registration, #6 Exhibit 5- Cert of Registration, #7 Exhibit 6- Cert of Registration, #8 Exhibit 7- Cert of Registration, #9 Exhibit 8- Trademark Service Mark Microsoft, #10 Exhibit 9- Trademark Principal Register Windows, #11 Exhibit 10- Trademark Principal Register Microsoft Office) (Karon, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. World Tech Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: James H. Corning
Represented By: Bonnie E. MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Verni
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Tech Investments LLC
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?