Logan County Board of County Commissioners v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Logan County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories,Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Noramco, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, SpecGX LLC and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2018op45047
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; The Kroger Co. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waivers of Service)(Majestro, Anthony)
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
April 5, 2019 Filing 29 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 27 Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Farrell, Jr filed by on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners. (Farrell, Paul)
March 11, 2019 Filing 26 Amended complaint SHORT FORM against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SPECGX, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, THE KROGER CO., RITE AID CORPORATION, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., WALMART INC., F/K/A WAL-MART STORES, INC.. Filed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. (Majestro, Anthony)
October 8, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
July 5, 2018 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018; Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018; Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
April 5, 2018 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
April 5, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
April 4, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
April 4, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
April 2, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 7, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Laboratories,Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 7, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 7, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 7, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 7, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 5, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 5, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 5, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
March 1, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. filed on behalf of Logan County Board of County Commissioners (Peterson, James)
January 16, 2018 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:17-cv-01097. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 12, 2018 Case transferred to District of Northern Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662,2:17-cv-663,2:17-cv-664,2:17-cv-665,2:17-cv-680,2:17-cv-682,2:17-cv-696, 2:17-cv-704,2:17-cv-713,2:17-cv-723,2:17-cv-768,2:17-cv-769,2:17-cv-770,2:17-cv-883, 2:17-cv-886,2:17-cv-891,2:17-cv-894,2:17-cv-904,2:17-cv-918,2:17-cv-975,2:17-cv-1012, 2:17-cv-1024,2:17-cv-1064,2:17-cv-1097,2:17-cv-1102,2:17-cv-1105,2:17-cv-1117,2:17-cv-1126, 2:17-cv-1132 ARE related. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on January 4, 2018. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Valle Tanoury for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Tanoury, Alana) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6244445), filed by Logan County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plf Attorney List) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan County Board of County Commissioners v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: James Charles Peterson
Represented By: Christina L. Smith
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Peterson
Represented By: James S. Nelson
Represented By: James C. Powell
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?