City of Columbus v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Columbus
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., McKesson Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Perry Fine, Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Actavis Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., PharmaOne, a/k/a Pharma-1, a/k/a Pharma1, n/k/a MVP Pharmacy, Mallinckrodt LLC, The Drug Store Pharmacy Inc., Actavis, Inc., East Main Street Pharmacy, Miami-Luken, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., The Drug Store Clinic Pharmacy Inc., Drug Store Pharmacy, a/k/a The Drug Store Clinic and Pharmacy, Indivior Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SpecGX LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC. and Sandoz Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45048
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 64 Attorney Appearance of Additional Counsel by Kathleen A. Nitschke filed by on behalf of The Drug Store Clinic Pharmacy Inc., The Drug Store Pharmacy Inc.. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 62 Attorney Appearance by Safa W. Osmani filed by on behalf of Indivior Inc.. (Osmani, Safa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 61 Attorney Appearance by Sara E. Silva filed by on behalf of Indivior Inc.. (Silva, Sara)
July 22, 2019 Filing 60 Attorney Appearance by Maria R. Durant filed by on behalf of Indivior Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
July 1, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Drug Store Clinic Pharmacy Inc.. (Roller, Jan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Drug Store Pharmacy Inc.. (Roller, Jan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 57 Attorney Appearance by Jan L. Roller filed by on behalf of The Drug Store Pharmacy Inc., The Drug Store Clinic Pharmacy Inc.. (Roller, Jan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 56 Return of Service by personal service executed upon PharmaOne, a/k/a Pharma-1, a/k/a Pharma1, n/k/a MVP Pharmacy on 6/11/2019, filed on behalf of City of Columbus Related document(s) #35 , #1 . (Carpenter, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 55 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Drug Store Pharmacy, a/k/a The Drug Store Clinic and Pharmacy on 6/10/2019, filed on behalf of City of Columbus Related document(s) #35 , #1 . (Carpenter, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 54 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Indivior Inc. on 6/7/2019, filed on behalf of City of Columbus Related document(s) #35 , #1 . (Carpenter, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Miami-Luken, Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 52 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon PharmaOne, a/k/a Pharma-1, a/k/a Pharma1, n/k/a MVP Pharmacy. (P,R)
June 10, 2019 Filing 51 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by City of Columbus. Related document(s) #35 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Carpenter, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 50 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Miami-Luken, Inc.. (P,R)
June 7, 2019 Filing 49 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by City of Columbus. Related document(s) #35 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Carpenter, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 46 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Drug Store Pharmacy, East Main Street Pharmacy, Indivior Inc., PharmaOne. (P,R)
June 5, 2019 Filing 45 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by City of Columbus. Related document(s) #35 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Attachment)(Carpenter, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 15, 2019 Filing 35 Amended complaint (Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants and Jury Demand) against Actavis Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Indivior Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Miami-Luken, Inc., PharmaOne, a/k/a Pharma-1, a/k/a Pharma1, n/k/a MVP Pharmacy, Drug Store Pharmacy, a/k/a The Drug Store Clinic and Pharmacy, East Main Street Pharmacy and adding new party defendant(s) Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGx LLC; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC; Indivior Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Sandoz Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.; Miami-Luken, Inc.; PharmaOne, a/k/a Pharma-1, a/k/a Pharma1, n/k/a MVP Pharmacy; Drug Store Pharmacy, a/k/a The Drug Store Clinic and Pharmacy; East Main Street Pharmacy. Filed by City of Columbus. (Carpenter, Michael)
March 14, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 2/1/2019, answer due 4/2/2019 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
March 14, 2019 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance by Lara N. Baker-Morrish filed on behalf of City of Columbus. (P,R)
October 8, 2018 Filing 32 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 30, 2018 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/28/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
March 1, 2018 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 28, 2018 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 28, 2018 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 28, 2018 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 21, 2018 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 21, 2018 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 13, 2018 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Lynn Webster waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 13, 2018 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Scott Fishman waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
February 13, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Perry Fine waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 29, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 29, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 29, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 29, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 29, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 25, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 23, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Columbus. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2018, answer due 3/23/2018. filed on behalf of City of Columbus (Barthel, David)
January 19, 2018 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance of Michael H. Carpenter, Timothy R. Bricker, Jonathan M. Cyrluk, David J. Barthel, and Stephen E. (Ned) Dutton by Michael H. Carpenter filed by on behalf of City of Columbus. (Carpenter, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:17-cv-01102. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 12, 2018 Case transferred to District of Northern Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662,2:17-cv-663,2:17-cv-664,2:17-cv-665,2:17-cv-680,2:17-cv-682,2:17-cv-696, 2:17-cv-704,2:17-cv-713,2:17-cv-723,2:17-cv-768,2:17-cv-769,2:17-cv-770,2:17-cv-883, 2:17-cv-886,2:17-cv-891,2:17-cv-894,2:17-cv-904,2:17-cv-918,2:17-cv-975,2:17-cv-1012, 2:17-cv-1024,2:17-cv-1064,2:17-cv-1097,2:17-cv-1102,2:17-cv-1105,2:17-cv-1117,2:17-cv-1126, 2:17-cv-1132 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on Janurary 5, 2018. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Valle Tanoury for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Tanoury, Alana) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6245372), filed by The City of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carpenter, Michael) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Columbus v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PharmaOne, a/k/a Pharma-1, a/k/a Pharma1, n/k/a MVP Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Drug Store Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Jan L. Roller
Represented By: Kathleen A. Nitschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Main Street Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Drug Store Clinic Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Jan L. Roller
Represented By: Kathleen A. Nitschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Store Pharmacy, a/k/a The Drug Store Clinic and Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Maria R. Durant
Represented By: Safa W. Osmani
Represented By: Sara E. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Columbus
Represented By: Michael H. Carpenter
Represented By: Lara N. Baker-Morrish
Represented By: Stephen E. Dutton
Represented By: Jonathan M. Cyrluk
Represented By: Timothy R. Bricker
Represented By: David J. Barthel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?