Wayne County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wayne County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Noramco, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Health Corporation and KVK-Tech, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45150
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Discount Drug Mart, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; KVK-Tech, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Specgx, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waivers of Service)(Majestro, Anthony)
April 8, 2019 Filing 42 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
March 11, 2019 Filing 39 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 38 Amended complaint SHORT FORM against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SPECGX, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, KVK-TECH, INC., DISCOUNT DRUG MART, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, RITE AID CORPORATION, WALMART INC., F/K/A WAL-MART STORES, INC.. Filed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. (Majestro, Anthony)
October 8, 2018 Filing 37 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
July 16, 2018 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 16, 2018 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2018, answer due 5/29/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 2, 2018 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 2, 2018 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 2, 2018 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 29, 2018 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 29, 2018 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 29, 2018 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/3/2018, answer due 7/2/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 6, 2018 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
May 3, 2018 Filing 27 Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Farrell, Jr filed by on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. (Farrell, Paul)
April 23, 2018 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 20, 2018 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 18, 2018 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 18, 2018 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 18, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 18, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 13, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 13, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 13, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 13, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 11, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
April 11, 2018 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Alana V. Tanoury filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Tanoury, Alana)
April 11, 2018 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Vincent I. Holzhall filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
April 11, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 4/6/2018, answer due 6/5/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 10, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 6, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 3, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of Wayne County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weinberger, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weinberger, Peter)
February 2, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8536631. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action MDL 2804. Filed by Wayne County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinberger, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayne County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Christina L. Smith
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: James S. Nelson
Represented By: James C. Powell
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?