City Of Lima v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City Of Lima
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Noramco, Inc., SpecGx LLC., Rite Aid Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45333
Filed: April 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 16, 2019 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
June 6, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. SpecGx LLC. waiver sent on 5/3/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Party Rite Aid Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., SpecGx LLC., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added. filed by City Of Lima. (Weinberger, Peter)
April 12, 2019 Filing 24 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 16, 2019 Filing 23 Amended complaint Short Form against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Rite Aid Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.; Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed by City Of Lima. (Weinberger, Peter)
July 19, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 7/18/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
July 17, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
July 17, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
July 17, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Purdue Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
July 17, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
July 17, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Insys Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
July 17, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 29, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 22, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 19, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 6/15/2018, answer due 8/14/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City Of Lima. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City Of Lima (Weinberger, Peter)
April 3, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8636161. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action MDL 2804. Filed by City Of Lima. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinberger, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of Lima v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Lima
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Anthony L. Geiger
Represented By: Dustin B. Herman
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: J. Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?